Larrison v. Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Larrison
Defendant: Mattsen Fisheries Inc, Mattsen Management LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC, Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC and Retriever Tender Alaska LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00906
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Add and Terminate Attorneys: per phone call from counsel, Mr. McLean is still counsel for defendants. (PM)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Attorney Meliha Jusupovic added as counsel for Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC and Retriever Tender Alaska LLC; Attorney Donald K McLean terminated per #26 Notice of Appearance. (Filer used Mr. McLean's login to post Notice of Appearance) (PM) Modified on 6/24/2020; per phone call from counsel, Mr. McLean is still counsel for Defendants (PM).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Donald K McLean Meliha Jusupovic on behalf of Defendants Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska LLC. (McLean, Donald) Modified on 6/24/2020 to correct appearing attorney. (PM).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Thomas George Waller for Defendants Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska LLC. (Waller, Thomas)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/13/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/20/2020. (LC)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Oregon and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Oregon, Case Number 3:19-cv-02053.
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting the parties' Stipulated Motion for Transfer of Venue #20 . This case is hereby Transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington at Seattle. Signed on 6/10/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Stipulated Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Filed by Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McLean, Donald) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by Richard Larrison. (Bunnell, Gregory) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint Notice of Dismissal of Party Filed by Richard Larrison. (Bunnell, Gregory) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held 4/6/20. Order resetting the following deadlines: Discovery is to be completed by 5/18/2020. The parties shall confer and submit a formal Joint Status Report which includes proposed/revised case management deadlines by 5/18/2020. Gregory Bunnell present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Donald McLean; Colin Folawn; Svetlana Spivak present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 4/6/2020 at 2:00PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC. (McLean, Donald) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC. (McLean, Donald) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC, Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC. (McLean, Donald) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice , Notice of Appearance of Donald K. McLean appearing on behalf of Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC Filed by on behalf of Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC. (McLean, Donald) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Mattsen Management, LLC. (Spivak, Svetlana) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Mattsen Management, LLC. (Spivak, Svetlana) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Svetlana P. Spivak is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Colin J. Folawn and Bert W. Markovich Filed by Mattsen Management, LLC. (Spivak, Svetlana) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Mattsen Fisheries, Inc.. (Folawn, Colin) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc.. Filed by Mattsen Fisheries, Inc.. (Folawn, Colin) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Thomas G. Waller appearing on behalf of Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC Filed by on behalf of Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC. (Waller, Thomas) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Bert W. Markovich appearing on behalf of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC Filed by on behalf of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC. (Markovich, Bert) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Colin J. Folawn appearing on behalf of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC Filed by on behalf of Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC. (Folawn, Colin) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mattsen Fisheries, Inc., Mattsen Management, LLC, Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC, Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/17/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6126440 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Richard Larrison against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Bunnell, Gregory) [Transferred from ord on 6/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larrison v. Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattsen Fisheries Inc
Represented By: Colin Jeffrey Folawn
Represented By: Bert W. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattsen Management LLC
Represented By: Svetlana P Spivak
Represented By: Colin Jeffrey Folawn
Represented By: Bert W. Markovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retriever Tender Alaska, LLC
Represented By: Donald K McLean
Represented By: Thomas George Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Beauty Seafoods LLC
Represented By: Donald K McLean
Represented By: Thomas George Waller
Represented By: Meliha Jusupovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retriever Tender Alaska LLC
Represented By: Donald K McLean
Represented By: Thomas George Waller
Represented By: Meliha Jusupovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Larrison
Represented By: Gregory A Bunnell
Represented By: Theodore P. Heus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?