Monson et al v. Puget Sound Gastroenterology PLLC
Plaintiff: Leah Monson and Raymond Monson
Defendant: Puget Sound Gastroenterology PLLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00975
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER FOR STAY OF CASE FOR PENDING SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, re: #7 Stipulated Motion; Case stayed. Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2020. (TF)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order for Stay of Case For Pending Settlement Negotiations, filed by Plaintiffs Leah Monson, Raymond Monson. Noting Date 7/30/2020, (Sulzberg, Jill)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Anthony Griffin on behalf of Defendant Puget Sound Gastroenterology PLLC. (Griffin, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Puget Sound Gastroenteroloty, PLLC and Gabriel T Welsh on 7/8/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Leah Monson, Raymond Monson. (Sulzberg, Jill)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Puget Sound Gastroenterology PLLC. (RE)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Praecipe To Issue Corrected Summons by Plaintiffs Leah Monson, Raymond Monson (Sulzberg, Jill)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
June 25, 2020 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (RE)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Puget Sound Gastroenterology PLLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6421316), filed by Raymond Monson and Leah Monson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sulzberg, Jill) Modified on 6/29/2020 to add additional filer (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monson et al v. Puget Sound Gastroenterology PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Monson
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Jill Sulzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Monson
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Jill Sulzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Gastroenterology PLLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?