Lin et al v. Kennewick et al
Plaintiff: Mei-Jui Lin and David Peterson
Defendant: Michael Kennewick, Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Richard Kennewick, Voicebox Technologies Corporation, Robert Kennewick and Todd Kenck
Case Number: 2:2020cv01029
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Relief From Briefing Deadlines in Relation to Motions to Transfer and Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/4/2020, (Isacke, Curtis)
August 26, 2020 Filing 34 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex. 5 to Supp. Dec. of Todd Kneck ISO Ind. Defs Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and Motion to Strike by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick re #33 MOTION to Seal Ex. 5 to Supp. Dec. of Todd Kneck ISO Ind. Defs Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and Motion to Strike, #31 Surreply, #32 Declaration (Cohen, Anne)
August 26, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Seal Ex. 5 to Supp. Dec. of Todd Kneck ISO Ind. Defs Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and Motion to Strike, filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/4/2020, (Cohen, Anne)
August 26, 2020 Filing 32 Supplemental DECLARATION of Todd Kenck filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cohen, Anne)
August 26, 2020 Filing 31 SURREPLY filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Anne)
August 24, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Intent to File Sur-Reply re #28 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick. (Cohen, Anne)
August 21, 2020 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Mei-Jui Lin filed by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FF)(Hollon, Gregory)
August 21, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hollon, Gregory)
August 20, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/11/2020, (Cohen, Anne)
August 20, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Transfer Case (Transfer Venue to District of Delaware), filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/11/2020, (Cohen, Anne)
August 20, 2020 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Regarding Exs 1-6 and 10-11, Filed Under Seal. Exhibits are to: 10-9-18 and 4-23-19 Declarations of Ted Hollifield) by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick (Cohen, Anne)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' #23 Stipulation: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/4/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/11/2020, Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Initial Scheduling Deadlines by parties (Isacke, Curtis)
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex 4 To Dec of T. Kneck ISO Kennewick Resp to Plfs' Mtn to Remand by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick re #16 MOTION to Seal Exs 1-4 to Declaration of Todd Kenick ISO Defs' Response to Plfs' Mtn to Remand, #17 Response to Motion, #18 Declaration, (Cohen, Anne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex 3 To Dec of T. Kneck ISO Kennewick Resp to Plfs' Mtn to Remand by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick re #16 MOTION to Seal Exs 1-4 to Declaration of Todd Kenick ISO Defs' Response to Plfs' Mtn to Remand, #17 Response to Motion, #18 Declaration, (Cohen, Anne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex 2 To Dec of T. Kneck ISO Kennewick Resp to Plfs' Mtn to Remand by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick re #16 MOTION to Seal Exs 1-4 to Declaration of Todd Kenick ISO Defs' Response to Plfs' Mtn to Remand, #17 Response to Motion, #18 Declaration, (Cohen, Anne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex 1 To Dec of T. Kneck ISO Kennewick Resp to Plfs' Mtn to Remand by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick re #16 MOTION to Seal Exs 1-4 to Declaration of Todd Kenick ISO Defs' Response to Plfs' Mtn to Remand, #17 Response to Motion, #18 Declaration, (Cohen, Anne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Todd Kenck filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick re #16 MOTION to Seal Exs 1-4 to Declaration of Todd Kenick ISO Defs' Response to Plfs' Mtn to Remand, #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cohen, Anne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick, to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Anne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Seal Exs 1-4 to Declaration of Todd Kenick ISO Defs' Response to Plfs' Mtn to Remand, filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/28/2020, (Cohen, Anne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs -- Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/17/2020, (Cohen, Anne)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Voicebox Technologies Corporation on 8/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson. (Isacke, Curtis)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Voicebox Technologies c/o Nuance Communications on 8/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson. (Isacke, Curtis)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Voicebox Technologies Corporation (MW)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson (Isacke, Curtis)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson (Isacke, Curtis)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Mei-Jui Lin filed by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Isacke, Curtis)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Curtis Isacke filed by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EE)(Isacke, Curtis)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiffs Mei-Jui Lin, David Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/21/2020, (Isacke, Curtis)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING DEADLINES: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/21/2020, Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Initial Scheduling Deadlines by parties re #4 Joint Status Report Order (Isacke, Curtis)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
July 2, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/9/2020. (SG)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
July 2, 2020 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SG)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Robert Kennewick. (Cohen, Anne) Modified on 7/2/2020 (KB).
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-02157-8 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6438020), filed by Robert Kennewick, Michael Kennewick, Richard Kennewick, Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang, Todd Kenck. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Dkt 171 - 6-5-20 - Plf Second Amd Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Dkt 1 - 1-22-19 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Dkt 2 - 1-22-19 - Order Setting Civil Case Schedule, #5 Exhibit Dkt 3 - 1-22-19 - Case Info Sheet and Area Designation, #6 Exhibit Dkt 4 - 1-22-19 - Aff of Service - Michael Kennewick - Served 8-7-18, #7 Exhibit Dkt 5 - 1-22-19 - Aff of Service - Nuance - Served 8-7-18, #8 Exhibit Dkt 6 - 1-22-19 - Aff of Service - RobertKennewick - Served 8-7-18, #9 Exhibit Dkt 7 - 1-22-19 - Aff of Service - Voicebox - Served 8-7-18, #10 Exhibit Dkt 8 - 1-22-19 - Aff of Service - RichardKennewick - Served 8-7-18, #11 Exhibit Dkt 9 - 1-22-19 - Note for Hearing - Plf Mtn to Amend Complaint, #12 Exhibit Dkt 10 - 1-22-19 - Plf Mtn to Amend Complaint, #13 Exhibit Dkt 11 - 1-22-19 - Dec of C. Isacke ISO Mtn to Amend Complaint, #14 Exhibit Dkt 12 - 1-28-19 - Nuance and Voicebox Resp to Plf's Mtn to Amend Complaint, #15 Exhibit Dkt 13 - 1-29-19 - COS - Nuance and Voicebox Resp to Plf's Mtn to Amend Complaint, #16 Exhibit Dkt 14 - 1-29-19 - Plf Reply ISO Mtn to Amend Complaint, #17 Exhibit Dkt 15 - 1-29-19 - Supp Dec of C. Isacke ISO Mtn to Amend Complaint, #18 Exhibit Dkt 16 - 1-20-19 - (SIGNED) Order Amending Case Schedule, #19 Exhibit Dkt 17 - 2-6-19 - (SIGNED) Order Granting Mtn to Amend Complaint, #20 Exhibit Dkt 18 - 2-15-19 - Plf First Amd Complaint, #21 Exhibit Dkt 19 - 2-26-19 - Nuance and Voicebox Answer, Defs and Aff Defs to Plf First Amd Complaint, #22 Exhibit Dkt 20 - 3-5-19 - Acceptance of Service - Kennewicks, #23 Exhibit Dkt 21 - 1-22-19 - Notice of Remand form USDC, #24 Exhibit Dkt 22 - 3-18-19 - Notice of Appearance - Kennewicks, #25 Exhibit Dkt 23 - 3-27-19 - Note for Hearing - Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Mtn to Dismiss, #26 Exhibit Dkt 24 - 3-27-19 - COS - Note for Hearing - Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Mtn to Dismiss, #27 Exhibit Dkt 25 - 4-24-19 - Kennewick Mtn to Dismiss, #28 Exhibit Dkt 26 - 4-24-19 - Dec of AC ISO Kennewick Mtn to Dismiss, #29 Exhibit Dkt 27 - 4-24-19 - Dec of T. Hollifield ISO Kennewick Mtn to Dismiss, #30 Exhibit Dkt 28 - 4-24-19 - COS - Kennewick Mtn to Dismiss, #31 Exhibit Dkt 29 - 4-24-19 - Kennewick Mtn to Seal Exs. 1-6; 10-11, #32 Exhibit Dkt 30 - 4-24-19 - COS - Kennewick Mtn to Seal Ex. 10 and 11, #33 Exhibit Dkt 31 - 4-24-19 - Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Mtn to Dismiss, #34 Exhibit Dkt 32 - 4-24-19 - COS - Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Mtn to Dismiss, #35 Exhibit Dkt 33 - 6-11-19 - Plf Resp to Kennewick Mtn to Dismiss, #36 Exhibit Dkt 34 - 6-11-19 - Dec of C. Isacke ISO Plf Resp to Kennewick Mtn to Dismiss, #37 Exhibit Dkt 35 - 6-14-19 - Plf's Resp to Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Reply, #38 Exhibit Dkt 36 - 6-14-19 - Response-PLA (dupliacte of 35 - they entered it 2xs), #39 Exhibit Dkt 37 - 6-17-19 - Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Reply, #40 Exhibit Dkt 38 - 6-17-19 - Kennewick Reply re Mtn to Dismiss, #41 Exhibit Dkt 39 - 6-17-19 - COS - Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Reply, #42 Exhibit Dkt 40 - 6-17-19 - Amended Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Reply, #43 Exhibit Dkt 41 - 6-17-19 - COS - Amended Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Reply, #44 Exhibit Dkt 42 - 6-19-19 - Plf Resp to Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Reply, #45 Exhibit Dkt 43 - 6-21-19 - (SIGNED) Minute Entry - Kennewick Mtn to Dismiss Taken Under Advisement, #46 Exhibit Dkt 44 - 6-27-19 - (SIGNED) Order Denying Kennewick Mtn to Dismiss, #47 Exhibit Dkt 45 - 6-27-19 - (SIGNED) Order Denying Kennewick Mtn to Exceed Word Limit in Reply, #48 Exhibit Dkt 46 - 6-27-19 - (SIGNED) Order Granting Kennewick's Mtn to Seal Seal Docs 10 and 11, #49 Exhibit Dkt 47 - 7-27-19 - (SIGNED) Order Denying Mtn to Exceed Word Limit as Not Necessary-, #50 Exhibit Dkt 49 - 7-1-19 - Plf Confirmation of Joinder of Parties, Claims and Defenses, #51 Exhibit Dkt 50 - 7-8-19 - Note for Hearing - Kennewick Mtn for Reconsideration, #52 Exhibit Dkt 51 - 7-8-19 - Kennewick Mtn for Reconsideration, #53 Exhibit Dkt 52 - 7-8-19 - COS - Kennewick Mtn for Reconsideration, #54 Exhibit Dkt 53 - 7-17-19 - (SIGNED) Order Denying Kennewick Mtn for Reconsideration, #55 Exhibit Dkt 54 - 8-7-19 - Kennewick Notice of Discretionary Review, #56 Exhibit Dkt 55 - 8-7-19 - COS - Kennewick Notice of Discretionary ReviewAffidavitDeclarationCertificateOfService, #57 Exhibit Dkt 56 - 8-21-19 - Plf Notice of Unavailability, #58 Exhibit Dkt 57 - 10-15-19 - Plf's Jury Demand, #59 Exhibit Dkt 58 - 10-15-19 - Kennewick's Mtn to Continue Trial Date, #60 Exhibit Dkt 59 - 10-15-19 - Dec of AC ISO Kennewick's Mtn to Continue Trial Date, #61 Exhibit Dkt 60 - 10-15-19 - Note for Hearing - Plf Mtn to Sep 3, 4, and 5 Causes of Actoin and to Continue Trial Dates, #62 Exhibit Dkt 61 - 10-15-19 - Plf Mtn to Sep Trial on 3rd, 4th, and 5th Causes, and Continue Trial Dates, #63 Exhibit Dkt 62 - 10-15-19 - Dec of C. Isack ISO Plf Mtn to Sep Trial on 3rd, 4th, and 5th Causes, and Continue Trial Dates Declaration, #64 Exhibit Dkt 63 - 10-15-19 - COS - 10-15-19 - Plf Mtn to Sep Trial on 3rd, 4th, and 5th Causes, and Continue Trial Dates, #65 Exhibit Dkt 64 - 10-16-19 - Notice of Hearing - Kennewick Mtn to Continue Trial Date, #66 Exhibit Dkt 65 - 10-16-19 - COS - Notice of Hearing - Kennewick Mtn to Continue Trial Date, #67 Exhibit Dkt 66 - 10-16-19 - Nuance and Voicebox Joinder in Plf Mtn to Sep Trials and Cont Trial Date, #68 Exhibit Dkt 67 - 10-21-19 - Kennewick Resp to Plf Mtn to Sep Trial, and Nuance Joinder, #69 Exhibit Dkt 68 - 10-21-19 - Nusance and Voicebox Resp to Kennewick Mtn to Continue Trial, #70 Exhibit Dkt 69 - 10-21-19 - COS - Nusance and Voicebox Resp to Kennewick Mtn to Continue Trial, #71 Exhibit Dkt 70 - 10-21-19 - Plf Resp to Kennewick Mtn to Continue Trial, #72 Exhibit Dkt 71 - 10-21-19 - COS - Kennewick Resp to Plf Mtn to Sep Trial, and Nuance Joinder, #73 Exhibit Dkt 72 - 10-22-19 - Nuance and Voicebox Reply ISO Plf Mtn to Sep Trial, #74 Exhibit Dkt 73 - 10-22-19 - COS - Nuance and Voicebox Reply ISO Plf Mtn to Sep TrialAffidavitDeclarationCertificateOfService, #75 Exhibit Dkt 74 - 10-22-19 - Plf Reply ISO Mtn to Separate Trial, #76 Exhibit Dkt 75 -10-29-19 - (SIGNED) Order Denying Kennewick Mtn to Stay Discovery, #77 Exhibit Dkt 76 - 10-29-19 - KENNEWICK CASE - (SIGNED) Case Schedule for Kennewick Defs - Plf 1st and 2nd Cause of Action - Bifurcated, #78 Exhibit Dkt 77 - 10-29-19 - NUANCE CASE - (SIGNED) Case Schedule for Nuance and Voice Box - Plf 3rd, 4th and 5th Cause of Action - Bifurcated, #79 Exhibit Dkt 78 - 10-29-19 - (SIGNED) Order Granting Plf's Mtn to Separate Trials on 3rd, 4th, adn 5th Causes of Action, #80 Exhibit Dkt 79 - 11-18-19 - NUANCE CASE - Nuance and Voicebox First Amd Answer, Defs, and Aff Defs to Plf First Amd Complaint and Ctrclaims, #81 Exhibit Dkt 80 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Joint Submission of Exs re Cross MSJ - Submitted by Plf and Nusance-Voicebox, #82 Exhibit Dkt 81 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Notice of Hearing - Plf MSJ against Nuance and Voicebox, #83 Exhibit Dkt 82 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Plf MSJ against Nuance and Voicebox, #84 Exhibit Dkt 83 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Dec of M. Subit ISO Plf MSJ against Nuance and Voicebox, #85 Exhibit Dkt 84 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Dec of D. Peterson ISO Plf MSJ against Nuance and Voicebox, #86 Exhibit Dkt 85 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Notice of Hearing - Nuance and Voicebox MSJ against Plf, #87 Exhibit Dkt 86 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Nuance and Voicebox MSJ against Plf, #88 Exhibit Dkt 87 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Dec of D. Thieme ISO Nuance and Voicebox MSJ against Plf, #89 Exhibit Dkt 88 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Dec of M. Kennewick ISO Nuance and Voicebox MSJ against Plf, #90 Exhibit Dkt 89 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Dec of N. Newark ISO Nuance and Voicebox MSJ against Plf, #91 Exhibit Dkt 90 - 11-25-19 - NUANCE CASE - Dec of T. Kenck ISO Nuance and Voicebox MSJ against Plf, #92 Exhibit Dkt 91 - 12-5-19 - (SIGNED) Order of Change of Judge - to take affect 1-13-20, #93 Exhibit Dkt 92 - 12-9-191 - NUANCE CASE - Plf's Reply to Nuance and Voicebox Counterclaims, #94 Exhibit Dkt 93 - 12-16-19 - NUANCE CASE - Defs Resp to Plfs MSJ, #95 Exhibit Dkt 94 - 12-16-19 - NUANCE CASE - Plf Resp to Defs MSJ, #96 Exhibit Dkt 95 - 12-16-19 - NUANCE CASE - Dec of D. Peterson ISO Plf Resp to Def MSJ, #97 Exhibit Dkt 96 - 12-16-19 - NUANCE CASE - Second Dec of T. Kenck ISO Plf Resp to Def MSJ, #98 Exhibit Dkt 97 - 12-18-19 - (SIGNED) Dkt 91 returned to Court - Mail Return-Unclaimed, #99 Exhibit Dkt 98 - 12-23-19 - NUANCE CASE - Def Reply ISO Def MSJ, #100 Exhibit Dkt 99 - 12-23-19 - NUANCE CASE - Plf Reply ISO Plf MSJ, #101 Exhibit Dkt 100 - 1-3-20 - NUANCE CASE - Court Minute Entry - Taking MSJs under Advisement, #102 Exhibit Dkt 101 - 1-6-20 - NUANCE CASE - (SIGNED) Order re Completion of Joint Conf of Trial Readiness - and providing deadlines, #103 Exhibit Dkt 102 - 1-10-20 - NUANCE CASE - (SIGNED) Order Granting MSJ and Denying Plf's Partial MSJ, #104 Exhibit Dkt 103 - 1-10-20 - NUACNE CASE - (SIGNED) Amended Order Granting MSJ and Denying Plf's Partial MSJ, #105 Exhibit Dkt 104 - 1-21-20 - NUANCE CASE - CostBill-$760.49 of Nuance and VoiceBox, #106 Exhibit Dkt 105 - 1-22-20 - Minute Entry - Status Hearing, #107 Exhibit Dkt 106 - 1-29-20 - NUANCE CASE - (SIGNED) Order Granting MSJ and Denying Plf's Partial MSJ, #108 Exhibit Dkt 107 - 2-4-20 - NUANCE CASE - Plf Notice of Appeal, #109 Exhibit Dkt 108 - 2-3-20 - KENNEWICK CASE - Ct of Appeals Cert of Finality of Kennewick Discretionary Review, Denied, #110 Exhibit Dkt 109 - 2-7-20 - NUANCE CASE - APPEAL - Nuance and VB Notice of Cross-Appeal, #111 Exhibit Dkt 110 - 2-24-20 - NUANCE CASE - APPEAL - Ct of Appeals ltr re Fiing of Notice of Appeals, #112 Exhibit Dkt 111 - 3-5-20 - NUANCE CASE - APPEAL - Copy of Designation of Clerk's Papers - For Ct of Appeals - with confirmation of filing, #113 Exhibit Dkt 112 - 3-5-20 - NUANCE CASE - APPEAL - COS - Designation of Clerk's Pa

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin et al v. Kennewick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kennewick
Represented By: Anne Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Gia-Shuh Jang
Represented By: Anne Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kennewick
Represented By: Anne Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voicebox Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy F. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kennewick
Represented By: Anne Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Kenck
Represented By: Anne Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mei-Jui Lin
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Curtis C Isacke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Peterson
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Curtis C Isacke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?