Daniels et al v. Northshore School District
Plaintiff: PattiJo Daniels and Gary Daniels
Defendant: Northshore School District
Case Number: 2:2020cv01041
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Northshore School District (TH)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS AMENDED by Plaintiffs Gary Daniels, PattiJo Daniels (Attachments: #1 Summons Corrected summons per Court Notice)(Cochrane, Jenny)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Exhibit 2 by Plaintiffs Gary Daniels, PattiJo Daniels (Cochrane, Jenny)
July 9, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re [1-2, 1-3] Exhibits to Complaint. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (MET)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
July 7, 2020 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff PattiJo Daniels (Cochrane, Jenny)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff PattiJo Daniels. (Cochrane, Jenny)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) PattiJo Daniels (Receipt # AWAWDC-6441126), filed by PattiJo Daniels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 2, #3 SEALED Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Cochrane, Jenny) Modified on 7/8/2020 seal document. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels et al v. Northshore School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northshore School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PattiJo Daniels
Represented By: Jenny Marie Cochrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Daniels
Represented By: Jenny Marie Cochrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?