Gahano v. Renaud et al
Petitioner: Denge Lemo Gahano
Respondent: Stephen Dove, William P Barr, Daniel M Renaud, Nathalie Asher, Chad Wolf and Matthew T Albence
Case Number: 2:2020cv01094
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by Respondents Matthew T Albence, Nathalie Asher, Chad Wolf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramnitz, Tim)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #16 Answer to Petition, filed by Petitioner Denge Lemo Gahano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Noted by Clerk for 9/18/2020. (LH)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying Petitioner's #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel and #8 Motion for Funds. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.(LH)(CC to Petitioner via mail on 8/27/2020)
August 17, 2020 #16 Response to #9 Amended Petition NOTED on motion calendar; Noted by clerk for 9/11/2020. (LH) (CC to Plaintiff via mail on 8/20/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #9 Amended Petition, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus , RESPONSE to #9 Amended Petition, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Matthew T Albence, Nathalie Asher, William P Barr, Stephen Dove, Daniel M Renaud, Chad Wolf. Noting Date 9/11/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Ramnitz, Tim)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Petitioner's #12 Third Motion for Stay of Removal. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(LH) (CC to Petitioner via mail on 8/17/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Respondents Matthew T Albence, Nathalie Asher, Chad Wolf (Ramnitz, Tim)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Petitioner's #12 MOTION for Stay of Removal. The Government is ordered to file a status update setting forth the timeline for Petitioner's removal. Status update due no later than noon on August 13, 2020. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (PM) cc: Petitioner via USPS on 8/12/2020
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Stay of Removal, filed by Petitioner Denge Lemo Gahano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (PM)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying Petitioner's #7 SECOND MOTION FOR STAY OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(LH) cc: ICE via email; petitioner via USPS on 8/10/2020
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Denge Lemo Gahano re #9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Denge Lemo Gahano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhihbit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(PM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 REPLACEMENT PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Release from Detention, filed by Denge Lemo Gahano. (PM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Fund for Invesigation and for Transcript, filed by Petitioner Denge Lemo Gahano. Noted by Clerk for 8/21/2020. (PM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 REPLACEMENT EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for a Stay of Deportation, filed by Petitioner Denge Lemo Gahano. Noted by Clerk for 8/6/2020 (PM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim Ramnitz on behalf of Respondents William P Barr, Stephen Dove, Daniel M Renaud. (Ramnitz, Tim)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION FOR STAY OF REMOVAL AND DIRECTING SERVICE by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Electronic posting of this Order, #1 2241 Petition and all supporting documents shall effect service on the United States Attorney and Respondent(s). Within 30 days of the date this Order is posted, Respondent(s) shall file a return and status report and note it on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file a response on or before the Monday immediately preceding the noting date. Respondent(s) may file a reply on or before the noting date. (cc: ICE via email; petitioner via USPS)(ST)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Denge Lemo Gahano. (SG)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Petitioner Denge Lemo Gahano. (SG)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # SEA101311), filed by Denge Lemo Gahano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gahano v. Renaud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Dove
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Tim Ramnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Tim Ramnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel M Renaud
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Tim Ramnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathalie Asher
Represented By: Tim Ramnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Tim Ramnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albence
Represented By: Tim Ramnitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Denge Lemo Gahano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?