Northwest Administrators Inc v. Northwest Asphalt Inc
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Northwest Asphalt Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01099
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' joint request, the initial scheduling deadlines are continued as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/2/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/9/2020, Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2020. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Asphalt Inc (Armstrong, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendant's #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant Northwest Asphalt, Inc. shall have an extension of time to file its responsive pleadings until September 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LH)
August 12, 2020 Attorney James Paul Murphy for Northwest Asphalt Inc added per #6 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, filed by Defendant Northwest Asphalt Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/12/2020, (Armstrong, Brian)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Armstrong on behalf of Defendant Northwest Asphalt Inc. (Armstrong, Brian)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/2/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/9/2020. (LC)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Northwest Asphalt Inc on 7/22/2020 (Reid, Russell)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Northwest Asphalt Inc (SG)
July 17, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Northwest Asphalt Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-6467914), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Northwest Asphalt Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Asphalt Inc
Represented By: Brian C Armstrong
Represented By: James Paul Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?