Northwest Administrators Inc v. DHL Express USA Inc
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: DHL Express USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01100
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Reset Deadline: Pursuant to the parties' #7 STIPULATION to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, the time for Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc. to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 9/16/2020. (VE)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by parties re #1 Complaint (Mills, Jason)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason S. Mills on behalf of Defendant DHL Express USA Inc. (Mills, Jason)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant DHL Express USA Inc on 7/27/2020 (Reid, Russell)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) DHL Express USA Inc (SG)
July 17, 2020 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) DHL Express USA Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-6468260), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. DHL Express USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Express USA Inc
Represented By: Jason S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?