Bank of the Pacific v. F/V Electra Blue et al
Plaintiff: Bank of the Pacific
Defendant: Zed Blue, F/V Electra Blue, Fishing Blues LLC and Robin Blue
Case Number: 2:2020cv01103
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re: Warrant for Arrest and Order on Substitute Custodian on 8/11/2020. (LH)
August 11, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re: Warrant for Arrest on 7/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Return of Service, #2 Return of Service)(LH)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Drew Fitzgerald Duggan on behalf of Plaintiff Bank of the Pacific. (Duggan, Drew)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian. Marine Lenders Services, LLC, is appointed as substitute custodian. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: 3 certified copies delivered to USMO on 7/17/2020
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 WARRANT for Arrest of Vessel issued re: F/V ELECTRABLUE, Official Number 567048, her tackle, engines, etc., and all other furniture or equipment thereunder appertaining and belonging to the ELECTRA BLUE, including the vessel's Crab Pots. (PM) cc: 3 certified copies delivered to USMO on 7/17/2020
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Arrest of Vessel. It is ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue a Warrant for Arrest of the F/V ELECTRA BLUE, Official Number 567048 and all its appurtenances, including the Crab Pots. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: 3 certified copies delivered to USMO on 7/17/2020
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Ad Hoc, Drew Duggan) (ST)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Robin Blue, Zed Blue, F/V Electra Blue, Fishing Blues LLC (ST) Modified to strike vessel name on 7/17/2020 (LH).
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Bank of the Pacific (Webster, Jess)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of BUCK FOWLER, JR filed by Plaintiff Bank of the Pacific re #5 Emergency MOTION to Appoint SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN (Webster, Jess)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Appoint SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN, filed by Plaintiff Bank of the Pacific. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order APPOINTING MARINE LENDERS SERVICES LLC AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN) Noting Date 7/31/2020, (Webster, Jess)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel F/V ELECTRA BLUE, filed by Plaintiff Bank of the Pacific. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF WARRANT OF ARREST, #2 Proposed Order WARRANT OF ARREST) Noting Date 7/31/2020, (Webster, Jess)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bank of the Pacific (Webster, Jess)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Bank of the Pacific. (Webster, Jess)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE PREFERRED MORTGAGE against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6469111) Attorney Jess Gilbert Webster added to party Bank of the Pacific(pty:pla), filed by Bank of the Pacific. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Webster, Jess)
July 16, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (ELS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the Pacific v. F/V Electra Blue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the Pacific
Represented By: Jess Gilbert Webster
Represented By: Drew Fitzgerald Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zed Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Electra Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fishing Blues LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?