State of Washington v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar and Alex M Azar
Amicus Curiae: M. D., House of Representatives, Local Governments, C. P., Northwest Health Law Advocates and National Health Law Program
Case Number: 2:2020cv01105
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated re #73 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. (LH)
September 8, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff State of Washington (Sutherland, Brian)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The court also ORDERS Washington to show cause within 10 days of the filing date of this order why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants Alex M Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Responding to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Holland, Liam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 70 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff State of Washington re: #68 Order to Show Cause, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sutherland, Brian)
August 20, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 8/14/2020 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2020, (ND)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Plaintiff's #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The court ORDERS the parties to show cause regarding the impact, if any, that the Asapansa-Johnson Walker injunction against HHS has on Washington's motion for a preliminary injunction. Both parties shall submit their responses to this order to show cause by 5:00 p.m. PDT on Wednesday, August 26, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Decision in Walker v. Azar, No. 20-cv-02834 (EDNY) ; filed by Defendants Alex M Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Holland, Liam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff State of Washington for proceedings held on 08/14/2020, Requesting Attorney: Marsha J. Chien. (Chien, Marsha)
August 17, 2020 Filing 65 SUPPLEMENT Memorandum by Defendants Alex M Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Holland, Liam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 64 SUPPLEMENT re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff State of Washington (Chien, Marsha)
August 14, 2020 Filing 63 Amicus BRIEF by Amicus National Health Law Program (Coursolle, Abigail)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The court ORDERS both parties to submit supplemental briefing on the topics in this order by 10:00 AM PDT on Monday, August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 14, 2020 Filing 61 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Marsha Chien, Brian Sutherland; Def Counsel: Liam Holland; CR: Nickie Drury; Zoom Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2020. The court hears argument from counsel re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. The court takes the matter under advisement; written order to be issued. (AD)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting Proposed Amici the National Health Law Program et al's #57 Motion for Leave to File an amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiff State of Washington's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The amicus curiae brief of the National Health Law Program et al. shall be filed within one court day of this Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM)
August 13, 2020 Filing 59 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Sutherland, Brian)
August 11, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Liam Holland on behalf of Defendants Alex M Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Holland, Liam)
August 10, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae, filed by Amicus National Health Law Program. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Proposed Brief, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/10/2020, (Coursolle, Abigail)
August 10, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE, by Defendants Alex M Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services, to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Lane, William)
August 10, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Kerwin Lane, III on behalf of Defendants Alex M Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lane, William)
August 10, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Abigail Coursolle on behalf of Amicus National Health Law Program. (Coursolle, Abigail)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re #45 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Abigail Coursolle for Amicus National Health Law Program, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 10, 2020 Filing 52 Amici Curiae Northwest Health Law Advocates', C.P.'s and M.D.'s BRIEF re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus Parties M. D., Northwest Health Law Advocates, C. P. (Hamburger, Eleanor)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting Local Governments' #46 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Local Government. The amicus curiae brief of Local Government Amici shall be filed the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(LH)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Agreed Parties' #39 Motion for Leave to File Brief of U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae in support of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(LH)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting Amici NoHLA, C.P., and M.D.'s #30 Motion for Leave Expedited Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The amicus curiae brief of NoHLA, C.P., and M.D., shall be filed within one court day of this Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(LH)
August 10, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric D Lowney on behalf of Amicus National Health Law Program. (Lowney, Eric)
August 7, 2020 Filing 47 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Plaintiff Amicus Curiae Local Governments (Van Kirk, Lorraine)
August 7, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curie Brief, filed by Plaintiff Amicus Curiae Local Governments. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Kirk, Lorraine)
August 7, 2020 Filing 45 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Abigail Coursolle FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus National Health Law Program (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6517541 (Hamburger, Eleanor) (Filed by Lowney, Eric)Modified on 8/10/2020 (DS).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER re Parties' #38 Joint Request for remote oral argument setting re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 02:00 PM via via Zoom videoconference before Judge James L. Robart. The State of Washington's reply brief on its motion for a preliminary injunction shall be due by 4:30 PM PDT on Thursday, August 13, 2020. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
August 7, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk on behalf of Plaintiff Amicus Curiae Local Governments. (Van Kirk, Lorraine)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #41 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk for Plaintiff Amicus Curiae Local Governments, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 41 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lorraine Van Kirk FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Amicus Curiae Local Governments (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6511801 (Franklin, Erica)
August 5, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erica R. Franklin on behalf of Plaintiff Amicus Curiae Local Governments. (Franklin, Erica)
August 4, 2020 Attorney Douglas Neal Letter added as counsel for House of Representatives per #39 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff. (PM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 39 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff, filed by Amicus House of Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief Amicus Curiae, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/3/2020, (Letter, Douglas)
August 3, 2020 Filing 38 REQUEST for Remote Oral Argument Setting by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Sutherland, Brian)
July 29, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Service filed by Amicus Parties M. D., Northwest Health Law Advocates, C. P. re #30 MOTION for Leave Motion For Expedited Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 29, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #30 MOTION for Leave Motion For Expedited Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief. Filed by Amicus Parties M. D., Northwest Health Law Advocates, C. P.. Noting Date 8/14/2020, (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 29, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 8/14/2020, (Sutherland, Brian)
July 29, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Janet Varon filed by Amicus Parties M. D., Northwest Health Law Advocates, C. P. re #30 MOTION for Leave Motion For Expedited Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 29, 2020 Attorney Eleanor Hamburger added as counsel for M. D., Northwest Health Law Advocates, and C. P. per #30 MOTION for Leave Motion For Expedited Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief. (PM)
July 29, 2020 Filing 33 Redacted DECLARATION of C.D. filed by Amicus Parties M. D., Northwest Health Law Advocates, C. P. re #30 MOTION for Leave Motion For Expedited Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 29, 2020 Filing 32 Redacted DECLARATION of P.P. filed by Amicus Parties M. D., Northwest Health Law Advocates, C. P. re #30 MOTION for Leave Motion For Expedited Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 29, 2020 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Eleanor Hamburger filed by Amicus Parties M. D., Northwest Health Law Advocates, C. P. re #30 MOTION for Leave Motion For Expedited Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 29, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave Motion For Expedited Leave To File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus Parties Northwest Health Law Advocates, C. P., M. D.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/7/2020, (Hamburger, Eleanor)
July 22, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington re #28 Notice of Pendency of Other Action (Luna, Neal)
July 21, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action ; filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Luna, Neal)
July 21, 2020 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated re [26} Notice to Filer. (ST)
July 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. ** Reminder** Documents omittedSee attached letter for more information and instructions. NOTE: Please disregard #26 Notice to Filer as it did not include the correct instructions. (ST)
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 7/27/2020. (ST) Modified on 7/21/2020. See docket #27 . (ST)
July 20, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re summons; served upon Defendants via certified mail; sent on 7/20/2020 by Plaintiff State of Washington (Luna, Neal) Modified on 7/21/2020 to include party and date summons mailed (PM).
July 20, 2020 Filing 24 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Alex M Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ST)
July 20, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (ST)
July 17, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington (Luna, Neal)
July 16, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Daniel Zeitlin filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Elayne Wylie filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Dr. Chelsea Unruh filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Jessica Todorovich filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Kenneth Shulman filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Michele Roberts filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of David Reed filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Kathy L. Oline filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Thea N. Mounts filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Bill Moss filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Jason McGill filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Everett Maroon filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Myron Bradford Mike Kreidler filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Beth Krehbiel filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Brandon Knox filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of David Iseminger filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Karter Booher filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 INDEX LIST re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #6 Declaration; #7 Declaration; #8 Declaration; #9 Declaration; #10 Declaration; #11 Declaration; #12 Declaration; #13 Declaration; #14 Declaration; #15 Declaration; #16 Declaration; #17 Declaration; #18 Declaration; #19 Declaration; #20 Declaration; #21 Declaration; #22 Declaration Declaration Index List by Plaintiff State of Washington (Chien, Marsha) Modified on 7/20/2020. Added links to declaration(s) and updated title to more accurately reflect the type of pleading filed. (ST)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/7/2020, (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian J Sutherland on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Sutherland, Brian)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marsha J. Chien on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Chien, Marsha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6469413), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Luna, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Brian J Sutherland
Represented By: Neal Harold Luna
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: William Kerwin Lane, III
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar
Represented By: William Kerwin Lane, III
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: M. D.
Represented By: Janet Varon
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: House of Representatives
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Local Governments
Represented By: Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk
Represented By: Erica R. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: C. P.
Represented By: Janet Varon
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwest Health Law Advocates
Represented By: Janet Varon
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Health Law Program
Represented By: Abigail Coursolle
Represented By: Eric D Lowney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?