Clark v. Eddie Bauer LLC et al
Plaintiff: Susan Clark
Defendant: Eddie Bauer Parent LLC and Eddie Bauer LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01106
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #17 Stipulation to Re-Note Motion. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk to renote Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #16 ) for October 16, 2020. Plaintiff must file its response to Defendants' motion no later than September 29, 2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (LH)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Re-note Motion and Amend Briefing Schedule by parties re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Levy, Marc)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC, Eddie Bauer Parent LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alison Woerman, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/18/2020, (Levy, Marc)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #12 stipulated motion to extend the time for Defendants to respond to the complaint. Defendants must respond to the complaint by 8/25/2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(LH)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Meegan Brooks for Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC, and Eddie Bauer Parent LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony Anscombe for Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC and for Eddie Bauer Parent LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC, Eddie Bauer Parent LLC. Noting Date 8/10/2020, (Levy, Marc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Meegan Brooks FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC, Eddie Bauer Parent LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6519914 (Levy, Marc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony Anscombe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC, Eddie Bauer Parent LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6519899 (Levy, Marc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephanie Sheridan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC, Eddie Bauer Parent LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6519844 (Levy, Marc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/23/2020, Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2020. (GT)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Shewmake on behalf of Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC, Eddie Bauer Parent LLC. (Shewmake, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marc C Levy on behalf of Defendants Eddie Bauer LLC, Eddie Bauer Parent LLC. (Levy, Marc)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Eddie Bauer LLC on 7/21/2020, filed by Plaintiff Susan Clark. (Corrington, Che)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE ON OREGON ATTORNEY GENERAL ; filed by Plaintiff Susan Clark. (Hattis, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Eddie Bauer LLC, Eddie Bauer Parent LLC (ST)
July 20, 2020 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6469483), filed by Susan Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hattis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Eddie Bauer LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Clark
Represented By: Che Z Corrington
Represented By: Daniel M Hattis
Represented By: Paul Karl Lukacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Bauer Parent LLC
Represented By: Meegan Brooks
Represented By: Anthony Anscombe
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Bauer LLC
Represented By: Meegan Brooks
Represented By: Anthony Anscombe
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?