Frei v Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: BRENT FREI
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01113
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Order Setting Schedule, #2 Exhibit 3 - Case Information Sheet, #3 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 5 - State Notification of Removal)(Bedell, Geoffrey)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew Beato for Federal Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/8/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/22/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Bedell, Geoffrey)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by Federal Insurance Company.(Bedell, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel J Standish for Defendant Federal Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 22, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to the case. (CDA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel J. Standish FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6479599 (Bedell, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew W. Beato FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6479559 (Bedell, Geoffrey)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
July 21, 2020 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CDA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc for Federal Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Bedell, Geoffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Service of Helen Thomas re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Bedell, Geoffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 20-2-10200-8; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6471818), filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex A -State Court Complaint, #3 Ex B - OIC Certificate of Service)(Bedell, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frei v Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Geoffrey C Bedell
Represented By: Daniel J Standish
Represented By: Matthew Beato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT FREI
Represented By: Lawrence Carl Locker
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?