Ramirez Alatorre v. Asher et al
Petitioner: Rene Ruben Ramirez-Alatorre and Rene Ruben Ramirez Alatorre
Respondent: Matthew T Albence, Stewart Smith, Nathalie R Asher, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Steven Langford
Case Number: 2:2020cv01147
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Eliana D. Horn filed by Petitioner Rene Ruben Ramirez Alatorre re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit)(Horn, Eliana)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Eva Lopez-Mendoza filed by Petitioner Rene Ruben Ramirez Alatorre re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Horn, Eliana)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Richard Kovar, M.D. filed by Petitioner Rene Ruben Ramirez Alatorre re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV - Dr. Richard Kovar)(Horn, Eliana)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Rene Ruben Ramirez-Alatorre filed by Petitioner Rene Ruben Ramirez Alatorre re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Horn, Eliana)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Petitioner Rene Ruben Ramirez Alatorre, to #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Horn, Eliana)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Dr. Sheri Malakhova, M.D. filed by Respondents Matthew T Albence, Nathalie R Asher, Stewart Smith, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Lambert, Michelle)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Drew H. Bostock filed by Respondents Matthew T Albence, Nathalie R Asher, Stewart Smith, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Lambert, Michelle)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Michelle R. Lambert filed by Respondents Matthew T Albence, Nathalie R Asher, Stewart Smith, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Lambert, Michelle)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Return Memorandum, filed by Respondents Matthew T Albence, Nathalie R Asher, Stewart Smith, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/25/2020, (Lambert, Michelle)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Respondents Matthew T Albence, Nathalie R Asher, Stewart Smith, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Lambert, Michelle)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Documents served electronically to United States Attorney on 7/29/20. (SG)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
July 27, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SG)
July 27, 2020 CORRECTED NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 3:20-cv-05740 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 2:20-cv-01147-RSM-BAT. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (ERA) Modified on 7/27/2020-correct judge assignment, clerical error regenerated notice to counsel (SG).
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # AWAWDC-6486852), filed by Rene Ruben Ramirez-Alatorre.(Horn, Eliana) Modified on 7/27/2020 regenerated documents to AUSA (SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez Alatorre v. Asher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rene Ruben Ramirez-Alatorre
Represented By: Eliana Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rene Ruben Ramirez Alatorre
Represented By: Eliana Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albence
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stewart Smith
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathalie R Asher
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Langford
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?