State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01191
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated re #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (LH)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Reinert, Christine)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Reinert, Christine)
August 7, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/14/2020. (CDA)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States of America (CDA)
August 7, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company United States of America (Receipt # AWAWDC-6514158), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reinert, Christine) Modified on 8/7/2020 correct text (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John Roderic MacMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?