GLY Construction Inc v. New Hampshire Insurance Co
Plaintiff: GLY Construction, Inc. and GLY Construction Inc
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company and New Hampshire Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv01221
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; & Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff GLY Construction Inc by New Hampshire Insurance Co.(Ricketts, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/13/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/19/2020. (LC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Michael Edward Ricketts. Filed by Defendant New Hampshire Insurance Co. (Ricketts, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant New Hampshire Insurance Co (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4)(Ricketts, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for New Hampshire Insurance Co. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by New Hampshire Insurance Co (Ricketts, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by GLY Construction Inc (Grace, Michael)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/24/2020. (MET)
August 13, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/20/2020. (SG)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
August 13, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Ricketts, Michael)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-10980-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6526905), filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Complaint)(Ricketts, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLY Construction Inc v. New Hampshire Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLY Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLY Construction Inc
Represented By: Michael P Grace
Represented By: Raz Barnea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?