State of Washington v. Office of Management and Budget
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Case Number: 2:2020cv01231
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/3/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Office of Management and Budget.(Fairchild, Katie)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant Office of Management and Budget. (Fairchild, Katie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Office of Management and Budget on 8/18/2020, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Office of Management and Budget. (RE)
August 18, 2020 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Office of Management and Budget (Receipt # AWAWDC-6534628) Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. Office of Management and Budget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Nathan Bays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?