State of Washington v. United States General Services Administration
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: U.S. General Services Administration and United States General Services Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv01233
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/3/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States General Services Administration.(Fairchild, Katie)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant United States General Services Administration. (Fairchild, Katie)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States General Services Administration on 8/18/2020, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case, related to C20-1231-RSL, reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas S. Zilly no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C20-1233-RSL. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States General Services Administration. (RE)
August 18, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. General Services Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-6534710) Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. United States General Services Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Nathan Bays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. General Services Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States General Services Administration
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?