Dwyer v. Trinity Financial Services LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Dwyer
Defendant: Trinity Financial Services, LLC and Trinity Financial Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01236
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Richard Dwyer, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Remand to King County Superior Court (Pope, Richard)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Defendant Trinity Financial Services LLC, to #12 MOTION to Remand to King County Superior Court. (McIntosh, Joseph)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to King County Superior Court, filed by Plaintiff Richard Dwyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand to King County Superior Court) Noting Date 10/9/2020, (Pope, Richard)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint; by Trinity Financial Services LLC.(McIntosh, Joseph)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/10/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Intent to Move for Entry of Default re #3 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Plaintiff Richard Dwyer. (Pope, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Trinity Financial Services LLC (McIntosh, Joseph)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
August 18, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/25/2020. (SG)
August 18, 2020 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Richard Dwyer (Pope, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Trinity Financial Services, LLC on 8/3/2020 (Pope, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Trinity Financial Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (McIntosh, Joseph)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number N/A; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6537733), filed by Trinity Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McIntosh, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwyer v. Trinity Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dwyer
Represented By: Richard Lamar Pope, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?