Bilbo et al v. Piper et al
Plaintiff: Nevin Pike and Tyler Bilbo
Defendant: F/V Pacific Jade and Drake Piper
Case Number: 2:2020cv01237
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Per request of plaintiffs' counsel, the Court finds good cause to continue the following deadlines: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/21/2020, Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020. (LC)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/21/2020. (LC)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Drake Piper (LH)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Tyler Bilbo, Nevin Pike (Webb, Gordon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gordon C Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Nevin Pike. (Webb, Gordon)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gordon C Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Tyler Bilbo. (Webb, Gordon)
August 18, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to attach document (Verification) re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Tyler Bilbo, Nevin Pike (Webb, Gordon)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants Attorney Gordon C Webb added to party Tyler Bilbo(pty:pla), filed by Tyler Bilbo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webb, Gordon) (Fee Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilbo et al v. Piper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevin Pike
Represented By: Gordon C Webb
Represented By: John W Merriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Bilbo
Represented By: Gordon C Webb
Represented By: John W Merriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Pacific Jade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?