Emch v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Corbin Emch
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv01238
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shata Stucky on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Stucky, Shata)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Corbin Emch re #6 Summons Issued, #5 Complaint (Bam, Maren)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons -01, #2 Summons -02) (KAM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Corbin Emch. (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) (Receipt # None- IFP Granted) (KAM)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER NOT TO PROVIDE COURTESY COPIES OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD: The Administration should not file a paper or CD courtesy copy of the Administrative Record for chambers in this matter. This does not modify the procedure for any other chambers. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT filed by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM)
August 18, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Corbin Emch. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Bam, Maren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emch v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corbin Emch
Represented By: Maren A Bam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Shata Stucky
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?