Piper et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Piper and Gary Piper
Defendant: FNBO, John Doe and JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2020cv01247
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause why this complaint should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiffs may do so by filing an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the issuance of this order. If Plaintiffs fail to state sufficient facts to support a cognizable legal theory, their complaint will be dismissed. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. CC to plaintiffs via US Mail. (GT)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Gary Piper, Brenda Piper. (TH)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Gary Piper, Brenda Piper. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(TH)
August 24, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Application: One of the exhibits provided ("Letter to Suspend Collection and Payments due to Corona Virus and Case Act") contains personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2 (pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2, SSNs must be redacted in their entirety). Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. cc plaintiffs via USPS on 08/25 (KB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- The APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is blank or incomplete. Please answer all the questions on the enclosed application and return it to the Court as soon as possible.- ADDITIONAL DEFICIENCY: The submitted Complaint is missing the signatures of both plaintiffs. Both plaintiffs must sign the complaint and return a copy to the Clerk's Office. NOTE re IFP application - Each plaintiff must submit an IFP application. Enclosed is an IFP application for each plaintiff. Filer has until 9/18/2020 to correct (CDA) cc plaintiffs via US Mail
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiffs Brenda Piper, Gary Piper. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover letter)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piper et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?