Pickard-Aguilar v. Washington State Employment Security Department et al
Plaintiff: Emanuel Enoch Pickard-Aguilar
Defendant: Department of Labor and Washington State Employment Security Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv01248
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/19/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER terminating defendant Department of Labor per plaintiff's #12 Response. Order entered at the direction of Judge David W. Christel. (GMR)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Emanuel Enoch Pickard-Aguilar (Pickard-Aguilar, Emanuel)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION Submit Oversize Document , filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Enoch Pickard-Aguilar. Noting Date 10/16/2020, (Pickard-Aguilar, Emanuel)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO CLARIFY by Judge David W. Christel. Clarification due by 10/21/2020.(KEB)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Washington State Employment Security Department.(Lefing, Debra)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Plaintiff Emanuel Enoch Pickard-Aguilar. Noting Date 9/25/2020, (Pickard-Aguilar, Emanuel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Debra Lefing on behalf of Defendant Washington State Employment Security Department. (Lefing, Debra)
August 29, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Washington State Employment Security Department on 8/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proof Service ESD, #2 Proof Service AG)(Pickard-Aguilar, Emanuel)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Department of Labor, Washington State Employment Security Department. (ERA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 PRAECIPE for a Summons SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant Washington State Employment Security Department. (Attachments: #1 Summons Will Serve to Defendant)(Pickard-Aguilar, Emanuel) Modified on 8/21/2020 (ERA).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE: Plaintiff Emanuel Enoch Pickard-Aguilar has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA) Modified on 8/19/2020 cc plaintiff via US Mail (CDA).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # SEA101627), filed by Emanuel Enoch Pickard-Aguilar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Email transmittal)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickard-Aguilar v. Washington State Employment Security Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuel Enoch Pickard-Aguilar
Represented By: Emanuel Enoch Pickard-Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Employment Security Department
Represented By: Debra Lefing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?