Rose-Holliday v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Kamala Rose-Holliday, M.D. and Kamala Rose-Holliday
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 2:2020cv01249
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Russell S. Buhite filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Buhite, Russell)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/6/2020, (Buhite, Russell)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to 10/13/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LH)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sun Life Financial Inc. for Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Buhite, Russell)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Russell Scott Buhite on behalf of Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Buhite, Russell)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/29/2020, (Buhite, Russell)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada on 8/24/2020, filed by Plaintiff Kamala Rose-Holliday. (Crawford, Melton)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/30/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (RE)
August 20, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Receipt # AWAWDC-6540546) Attorney Melton L Crawford added to party Kamala Rose-Holliday, M.D.(pty:pla), filed by Kamala Rose-Holliday, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Crawford, Melton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose-Holliday v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamala Rose-Holliday, M.D.
Represented By: Melton L Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamala Rose-Holliday
Represented By: Melton L Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Russell Scott Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?