Norman v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Brad Norman
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Indemnity Company a foreign insurer in the State of Washington doing business as Travelers
Case Number: 2:2020cv01250
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Hampton, Joseph)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2020, Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020. (GT)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
August 20, 2020 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Travelers Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Travelers Indemnity Company (Hampton, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company (Hampton, Joseph)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-10988-6-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6541040), filed by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hampton, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Joseph D Hampton
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Kierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company a foreign insurer in the State of Washington doing business as Travelers
Represented By: Joseph D Hampton
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Kierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Norman
Represented By: David LaCross
Represented By: Sunshine M Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?