Chaudhry v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nasrullah Chaudhry
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc., John Does 1-5 and Walmart Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01251
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by Walmart Inc.(Troy, Colin)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Walmart Inc (Troy, Colin)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip B Grennan on behalf of Defendants John Does 1-5, Walmart Inc. (Grennan, Philip)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wal-Mart Inc (Troy, Colin)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Wal-Mart Inc. must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/27/2020. (RE)
August 20, 2020 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Colin Troy in Support of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc. (Troy, Colin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 20-2-03444-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6541174), filed by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Troy, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaudhry v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Joseph Troy
Represented By: Philip B Grennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Represented By: Philip B Grennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Colin Joseph Troy
Represented By: Philip B Grennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasrullah Chaudhry
Represented By: Mark W D O'Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?