Seattle Symphony Orchestra v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Seattle Symphony Orchestra doing business as Seattle Symphony
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01252
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Please be advised that an additional case has been added to the list of related COVID-19 Business Insurance cases assigned to the undersigned. See Seattle Gymnastics Academy Inc. v. Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. (20-cv-00884). Please see the attached updated list of all relevant cases. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court orders that counsels' meet and confer take place within the next two weeks, reporting back to the Court no later than October 20, 2020 as to counsels' readiness to meet with the Court. At that time counsel shall jointly suggest to the Court several dates and times convenient for them to meet with the Court. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(TH)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case by Clerk William M McCool. (AQ)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Seattle Symphony Orchestra (Williams-Derry, Amy)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (RE)
August 20, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (RE)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Seattle Symphony Orchestra must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/27/2020, if applicable. (RE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Hartford Fire Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6541455), filed by Seattle Symphony Orchestra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Williams-Derry, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seattle Symphony Orchestra v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seattle Symphony Orchestra doing business as Seattle Symphony
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Franklin Dennis Cordell
Represented By: Kasey D Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?