Mahoney v. Expedia Inc
Plaintiff: Daniel Mahoney
Defendant: Expedia, Inc. and Expedia Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01296
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (MW)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Daniel Mahoney (Johnson, Daniel)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Daniel Mahoney (Johnson, Daniel)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/19/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/2/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
August 31, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Expedia Group, Inc. for Expedia, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Expedia, Inc. (Bugaighis, Zana)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Paul Ip re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Expedia, Inc. (Bugaighis, Zana)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Expedia, Inc. (Bugaighis, Zana)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Filing Notice of Removal by Defendant Expedia, Inc. (Bugaighis, Zana)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-11848-6 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6562335) Attorney Zana Bugaighis added to party Expedia, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Expedia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Bugaighis, Zana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahoney v. Expedia Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Zana Bugaighis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Inc
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Zana Bugaighis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mahoney
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?