Securities and Exchange Commission v. Sperry et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commision and Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Sperry and Sons Capital Investments, LLC, Kirk Sperry and Sperry and Sons Capital Investments LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01337
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney Edward Paul Weigelt, Jr added to party Kirk Sperry(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Paul Weigelt, Jr added to party Sperry and Sons Capital Investments LLC(pty:dft) by Kirk Sperry, Sperry and Sons Capital Investments LLC.(Weigelt, Edward)
October 7, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #3 Waiver of Service re Kirk Sperry: corrected name of party waiving service; #4 Waiver of Service re: Sperry Sons Capital Investments, LLC: added name of party waiving service and date of mailing. (PM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons as to Defendant Sperry Sons Capital Investments, LLC; mailed on 9/17/2020 (Quintanilla, Silvana) Modified on 10/7/2020 to add name of party waiving service and date of mailing (PM).
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Securities and Exchange Commission Kirk Sperry mailed on 9/17/2020 (Quintanilla, Silvana) Modified on 10/7/2020 to correct name of party waiving service (PM).
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Kirk Sperry, Sperry and Sons Capital Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons- Kirk Sperry)(RE)
September 10, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Silvana A Quintanilla added to party Securities and Exchange Commision(pty:pla), filed by Securities and Exchange Commision. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Kirk Sperry), #3 Summons (Sperry and Sons Capital Investments, LLC))(Quintanilla, Silvana) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Sperry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sperry and Sons Capital Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Sperry
Represented By: Edward Paul Weigelt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sperry and Sons Capital Investments LLC
Represented By: Edward Paul Weigelt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commision
Represented By: Silvana A Quintanilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Silvana A Quintanilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?