Johansen v. EFinancial LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth Johansen
Defendant: EFinancial LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01351
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Vericity Holdings, Inc. for EFinancial LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by EFinancial LLC (Howard, John)
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by EFinancial LLC.(Howard, John)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony Paronich for Plaintiff Kenneth Johansen, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/5/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/19/2020, Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2020. (AQ)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AQ)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Avi R Kaufman for Plaintiff Kenneth Johansen, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Corrected counsel's name on 10/7/2020 (DS).
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Avi R. Kaufman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Kenneth Johansen (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6649383 (Strauss, Samuel) Local Counsel maintains offices in Seattle, WA and Madison, WI 10/7/2020 (DS).
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony I. Paronich FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Kenneth Johansen (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6649376 (Strauss, Samuel) Local Counsel maintains offices in Seattle, WA and Madison, WI on 10/7/2020 (DS).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida, re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time; EFinancial LLC answer due 10/29/2020. (TF)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/14/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Andrew Howard on behalf of Defendant EFinancial LLC. (Howard, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Defendant EFinancial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/7/2020, (Howard, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on EFinancial LLC on 9/17/2020, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Johansen. (Strauss, Samuel)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant EFinancial LLC. (RE)
September 14, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (RE)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kenneth Johansen (Strauss, Samuel)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) EFinancial LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # CWAWDC-6592621), filed by Kenneth Johansen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Strauss, Samuel) Modified on 9/11/2020 - counsel to re-file corrected version of summons (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johansen v. EFinancial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Johansen
Represented By: Samuel J Strauss
Represented By: Anthony Paronich
Represented By: Avi R Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFinancial LLC
Represented By: John Andrew Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?