Swank et al v. DePuy Synthes Sales Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dallas Swank and Jeanne Pascal
Defendant: John Does I-X, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson and DePuy Synthes Sales Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01373
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lauren King
Referring Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jeanne Pascal, Dallas Swank, to #28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #27 Order on Motion for Discovery . (Lopez, Carl)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Amending Briefing Schedule. DePuy's #28 MOTION for Reconsideration is RENOTED for 4/15/2022. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Requesting Briefing on Defendants' #28 MOTION for Reconsideration. The Court ORDERS plaintiffs to respond to DuPuy's motion for reconsideration by 4/4/2022; DuPuy may file an optional reply brief by 4/8/2022. DePuy's motion for reconsideration is RENOTED for consideration on 4/8/2022. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW)
March 28, 2022 Filing 29 Second DECLARATION of Robert S. Hastings filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc re #28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #27 Order on Motion for Discovery (Talcott, Anne)
March 28, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #27 Order on Motion for Discovery , filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/28/2022, (Talcott, Anne)
March 28, 2022 MOTION REFERRED: #28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #27 Order on Motion for Discovery is referred to Judge Brian A Tsuchida. (NAW)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #23 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(MW)
March 10, 2022 MOTION REFERRED: #23 MOTION for Discovery is referred to Judge S. Kate Vaughan. (NAW)
March 10, 2022 MOTION REFERRED: #23 MOTION for Discovery is referred to Judge Brian A Tsuchida. This motion is no longer referred to Judge S. Kate Vaughan. (NAW)
March 4, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jeanne Pascal, Dallas Swank, TO RESPONSE to #23 MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Lopez, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lopez, Carl)
February 28, 2022 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Robert S. Hastings filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc re #23 MOTION for Discovery (Talcott, Anne)
February 28, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE, by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, to #23 MOTION for Discovery . Oral Argument Requested. (Talcott, Anne)
February 17, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Discovery , filed by Plaintiffs Jeanne Pascal, Dallas Swank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 3/4/2022, (Lopez, Carl)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Amend Case Schedule signed by Judge Lauren King. Jury Trial is continued to 11/7/2022 before Judge Lauren King. Motions related to discovery due by 2/18/2022, Disclosure of Plaintiffs' expert reports due by 4/21/2022, Depositions of Plaintiffs' experts due by 5/12/2022, Disclosure of Defendants' expert reports due by 6/2/2022, Depositions of Defendants' experts due by 6/30/2022, All dispositive motions due by 7/8/2022, All motions related to expert witnesses due by 7/15/2022, All motions in limine due by 9/30/2022, Agreed pretrial order due by 10/14/2022, Trial briefs, proposed voir dire questions, and jury instructions are due by 10/14/2022. Pretrial conference set for 10/21/2022 at 10:00am before Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 1, 2022 Filing 21 Agreed MOTION to Amend Case Schedule, filed by Plaintiffs Jeanne Pascal, Dallas Swank. Noting Date 2/1/2022, (Lopez, Carl)
January 24, 2022 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION to Amend Case Schedule, filed by Plaintiffs Jeanne Pascal, Dallas Swank. Noting Date 1/24/2022, (Lopez, Carl)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
December 20, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Lauren King. Judge Thomas S. Zilly no longer assigned to the case. (KK)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re Parties' #17 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson. Noting Date 11/4/2021, (Talcott, Anne)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Parties' #15 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Jury Trial is set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/29/2021, Discovery Motions due by 1/6/2022, Discovery to be completed by 2/14/2022, Dispositive motions due by 3/17/2022, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 3/24/2022, Motions in Limine due by 5/5/2022, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2022, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 5/20/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW)
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiffs Jeanne Pascal, Dallas Swank. Noting Date 10/21/2021, (Lopez, Carl)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne M Talcott on behalf of Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc. (Talcott, Anne)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES: Jury Trial (10 days) is set for 4/4/2022 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 9/13/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/27/2021, Discovery Motions due by 10/11/2021, Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/29/2021, Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2021, Discovery to be completed by 12/13/2021, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 1/20/2022, Motions in Limine due by 3/3/2022, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2022, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 3/18/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10. Filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc.(Campbell, Jennifer)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, docket no. #10 , plaintiffs' claims against defendant Johnson & Johnson are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs. From this point forward, this case shall be captioned as Swank, et al. v. DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., et al. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Johnson & Johnson by parties (Campbell, Jennifer)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)- re: #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Campbell, Jennifer)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney J T Larson, Jr for Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, and Johnson & Johnson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY J. T. Larson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6610129 (Campbell, Jennifer)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/17/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)
September 18, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #1 Notice of Removal, (Campbell, Jennifer)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DePuy Orthopaedics, inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Campbell, Jennifer)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Campbell, Jennifer)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 20-2-03984-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6605762), filed by DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Campbell, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swank et al v. DePuy Synthes Sales Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: J T Larson, Jr
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: J T Larson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Campbell
Represented By: J T Larson, Jr
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Swank
Represented By: Carl A Taylor Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Pascal
Represented By: Carl A Taylor Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?