Peters v. Monroe et al
Plaintiff: Byron L Peters
Defendant: Mark Christian Greco, Kip Andrew Harrison, The Law Office of Glasser and Glasser PLC, William Hanes Monroe, Jr and Kip Andrew Harbison
Case Number: 2:2020cv01422
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #12 #14 Motions for Extension of Time. The parties are granted an additional thirty days to comply with each deadline set out in the Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report and Early Settlement at page 1 of that Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Plaintiff
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mark Christian Greco, Kip Andrew Harbison, William Hanes Monroe, Jr, The Law Office of Glasser and Glasser PLC (MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff Byron L Peters (MW)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff Byron L Peters. Noted by Clerk for 12/4/2020 (MW)
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Byron L Peters. Noted by Clerk for 11/27/2020. (PM)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discover Issues, filed by Plaintiff Byron L Peters. Noted by Clerk for 11/20/2020. (PM)
November 4, 2020 ***Motion terminated per direction of chambers: #9 MOTION for Clarification filed by Byron L Peters. Clerk sent summons forms for Plaintiff to complete and return for issuance. (PM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerk to Plaintiff re summons to complete. (PM) cc: letter and 4 summonses sent to Plaintiff via USPS
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/19/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/27/2020. signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (CC: Plaintiff via USPS) Modified on 10/22/2020 (GC).
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Clarification, filed by Plaintiff Byron L Peters. Noted by Clerk for 10/30/2020. (PM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Byron L Peters. Noting Date 10/23/2020, (PM)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Byron L Peters. Noted by Clerk for 10/23/2020. (PM)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATE to Missing Pages by Plaintiff re #5 Complaint; re: Notice to Filer. (PM)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mark Christian Greco, Kip Andrew Harbison, William Hanes Monroe, Jr, The Law Office of Glasser and Glasser PLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Byron L Peters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 (missing pages 37, 38), #2 Exhibit 24-27 (missing pages 51,52, 57), #3 SEALED Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 SEALED Exhibit 30, #6 SEALED Exhibit 31-52, #7 Exhibit 52 (continued) - 74 (missing page 111), #8 SEALED Exhibit 75, #9 Exhibit 76-92 (missing pages 137, 138 and 139), #10 SEALED Exhibit 93, #11 Exhibit 94-103 (missing page 173), #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Transmittal forms)(PM)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS on 9/29/2020
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA) Modified on 9/25/2020 cc plaintiff via US Mail (CDA).
September 25, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Exhibits to Complaint). Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. The documents to redact are mailed with this entry. Please note there are also missing pages to the exhibits. Pages 37, 38, 51, 52, 57, 88, 111, 137, 138, 139 and 173. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L Peterson, filed by Byron L Peters. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-23 (missing pages 37, 38), #3 Exhibit 24-27 (missing pages 51,52, 57), #4 Exhibit 28 SEALED , #5 Exhibit 29, #6 Exhibit 30 SEALED , #7 Exhibit 31-52 (missing page 88), #8 Exhibit 52 (continued) - 74 (missing page 111), #9 Exhibit 75 SEALED , #10 Exhibit 76-92 (missing pages 137, 138 and 139), #11 Exhibit 93 SEALED , #12 Exhibit 94-103 (missing page 173), #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Transmittal forms)(CDA) Modified on 9/25/2020 sealed some exhibits due to unredacted personal identifiers (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Monroe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron L Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Christian Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Andrew Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Office of Glasser and Glasser PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hanes Monroe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Andrew Harbison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?