Valdivia v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Gino Paul Valdivia
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections, Stephen Sinclair, Daniel S Johnson and Monroe Correctional Complex
Case Number: 2:2020cv01429
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/7/2020,Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2020. (KMP)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and Amended General Order 02-19. (KMP)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/2/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Daniel S Johnson, Monroe Correctional Complex, Stephen Sinclair, Washington State Department of Corrections.(Ceder, Timothy)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy Ceder on behalf of Defendants Daniel S Johnson, Monroe Correctional Complex, Stephen Sinclair, Washington State Department of Corrections. (Ceder, Timothy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Daniel S Johnson on 10/2/2020; Stephen Sinclair on 10/2/2020 (Valdivia, Gino)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Daniel S Johnson, Stephen Sinclair (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KMP)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Gino Paul Valdivia (Valdivia, Gino) Modified on 10/1/2020 - Summonses received. To be issued. (KMP)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE: Plaintiff Gino Paul Valdivia has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # SEA102076), filed by Gino Valdivia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Email transmittal)(CDA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2020: #3 Signature page to Complaint) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdivia v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By: Timothy Ceder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Represented By: Timothy Ceder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel S Johnson
Represented By: Timothy Ceder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Correctional Complex
Represented By: Timothy Ceder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gino Paul Valdivia
Represented By: Gino Paul Valdivia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?