Integrative Health Institute PLLC et al v. Schaffner et al
Plaintiff: Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Nutrition, LLC, KS Distributors LLC, Integrative Health Institute PLLC a Washington professional limited liability Company doing business as Sophia Health Institute, Sophia Education, LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC and Sophia Education LLC
Defendant: Christine Schaffner, Bella Fiore Klinik, PLLC, Bella Fiore Organics, LLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care, LLC, Daniel Schaffner, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC and Lumvi Skincare, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01471
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadline: The deadline for any party to move to reopen this case in the event settlement is not perfected is extended to 120 days from the date of the Court's #214 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Should additional time be needed to perfect settlement, counsel is directed to contact this Court's courtroom deputy. (VE)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: THE COURT having been notified of the settlement of this matter and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. In the event settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided such motion is filed no later than 60 days from the date of this Order. All deadlines previously set are hereby STRICKEN. Should additional time be needed to perfect settlement, counsel is directed to contact this Court's courtroom deputy. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting Parties' #211 Stipulated MOTION to Seal. It is ORDERED that the Clerk shall seal the documents filed under the docket numbers #206 , #207 , #208 , #209 and their docket entries. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Motion terminated: #206 MOTION to Dismiss OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR AN ADVERSE INFERENCE INSTRUCTION DUE TO PLAINTIFFS SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE is terminated as moot, per the direction of chambers. (SR)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE of Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiffs and by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner (Demmon, Nicole)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Dckt Nos. #206 , #207 , #208 and #209 , filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC. Noting Date 8/12/2022, (Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 8/15/2022 to correct title and create linkage (SR).
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. S. Kate Vaughan- Dep Clerk: S. Prather; Pla Counsel: Farnoosh Faryabi, Mark Kimball, Michael Kyllo, Kristen Gotch; Def Counsel: David Silke, Michael Jacobs, Nicole Demmon, Teruyuki Olsen, Harbinder Johal; CR: Zoom Recording; Time of Hearing: 9:30AM; Courtroom: Zoom;Settlement Conference held on 8/9/2022. Parties appear via Zoom. Case settled. The Court orders the Settlement Agreement to be filed no later than 8/12/2022. (SNP)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SEALED NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #206 MOTION to Dismiss OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR AN ADVERSE INFERENCE INSTRUCTION DUE TO PLAINTIFFS SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE. Filed by Defendants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Counter Claimants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. Noting Date 9/2/2022, (Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 8/16/2022 to seal entry per dkt. #213 (SR).
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 SEALED DECLARATION of Teruyuki S. Olsen filed by Defendants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Counter Claimants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #206 MOTION to Dismiss OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR AN ADVERSE INFERENCE INSTRUCTION DUE TO PLAINTIFFS SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 8/16/2022 to seal entry per dkt. #213 (SR).
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SEALED DECLARATION of Michael G. Jacobs filed by Defendants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Counter Claimants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #206 MOTION to Dismiss OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR AN ADVERSE INFERENCE INSTRUCTION DUE TO PLAINTIFFS SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 8/16/2022 to seal entry per dkt. #213 (SR).
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR AN ADVERSE INFERENCE INSTRUCTION DUE TO PLAINTIFFS SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE, filed by Defendants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Counter Claimants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 9/2/2022 8/19/2022, (Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 8/1/2022 to re-note noting date per dkt. #209 (SR). Modified on 8/16/2022 to seal entry per dkt. #213 (SR).
July 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Farnoosh Faryabi for Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC from August 15, 2022 through August 22, 2022. (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Michael G Jacobs for Defendants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Counter Claimants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner from June 30, 2022 - July 25, 2022. (Jacobs, Michael)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 DECLARATION Confirming Completion of ESI of Shellie McGaughey by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt (McGaughey, Shellie)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 DECLARATION Re ESI Protocol and Production of Jeff Whitney by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt (McGaughey, Shellie)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting Parties' #200 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Discovery Re: Depositions & Daubert Motion Deadlines. Dispositive motions due by 9/13/2022. Motions to exclude expert testimony due by 9/13/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Discovery Re: Depositions & Daubert Motion Deadlines, filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2022, (Demmon, Nicole)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Michael G Jacobs for Defendants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Counter Claimants Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner from June 22, 2022 - July 8, 2022. (Jacobs, Michael)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael G Jacobs on behalf of Defendant Daniel Schaffner, Counter Claimant Daniel Schaffner. (Jacobs, Michael)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Hon. S. Kate Vaughan for Settlement Conference. (TF)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. Settlement Conference set for 8/9/2022 at 09:30 AM before Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SNP)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting Parties' #195 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Discovery Re: Depositions & Daubert Motion Deadlines. Depositions deadline is 6/24/2022 Motions to exclude expert testimony due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.(MW)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Discovery Re: Depositions & Daubert Motion Deadlines, filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/2/2022, (Demmon, Nicole)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Teruyuki S Olsen for Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner from July 15-18, 2022; August 12, 2022. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kate Vaughan for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. The parties will be contacted by Judge Vaughan's staff regarding scheduling. (VE)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Nicole E. Demmon for Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner from May 27 through and including May 31, 2022. (Demmon, Nicole)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Farnoosh Faryabi of #190 Electronic Transcript. Redaction Request due 6/10/2022, (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on 4/8/2022 before Judge Michelle L. Peterson.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Sheri Schelbert, sheri_schelbert@wawd.uscourts.gov, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2022, (Schelbert, Sheri)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner for proceedings held on 04/08/2022 re 176 Discovery Hearing,,,. Requesting Attorney: Michael G Jacobs.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Sheri Schelbert (sheri_schelbert@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8507) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Jacobs, Michael)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER ADOPTING #162 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Counterclaim Defendant Dr. Dietrich Klinghardt's Motion for Summary Judgment (dkt. #130 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part: (a) Counterclaim Defendant's Motion is DENIED as to the misrepresentation claim; (b) Counterclaim Defendant's Motion is DENIED without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d), as to the claims for tortious interference and defamation; (c) Counterclaim Plaintiff Dr. Christine Schaffner's claims for breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing and constructive discharge are DISMISSED with prejudice; and (d) Counterclaim Plaintiff's abuse of process claim is DISMISSED as stipulated by the parties. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting Defendant Christine Schaffner's #178 Motion to Reopen the Deposition of Plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt. Defendant Schaffner shall be afforded a three-hour deposition of Dr. Klinghardt. The deposition shall be completed no later than 5/24/2022 and may be conducted via video conferencing. The parties are further directed to provide an in camera transcript of the deposition to the Court within five business days of receiving the transcript from the court reporter by emailing it to: Tim_Farrell@wawd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Farnoosh Faryabi for Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC from June 3, 2022-June 13, 2022. (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 EXHIBIT 7 re #183 Reply to Response to Motion, #184 Declaration by Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner (Jacobs, Michael)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Supplemental DECLARATION of Michael G. Jacobs filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner re #178 MOTION for Order Reopening Plaintiff Dr. Klinghardts deposition (Jacobs, Michael)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REPLY, filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner, TO RESPONSE to #178 MOTION for Order Reopening Plaintiff Dr. Klinghardts deposition (Jacobs, Michael)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC re #178 MOTION for Order Reopening Plaintiff Dr. Klinghardts deposition (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, to #178 MOTION for Order Reopening Plaintiff Dr. Klinghardts deposition. (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re Parties' #179 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery to be completed by 5/31/2022, Dispositive motions and motions to exclude expert testimony for failure to satisfy Daubert due by 7/18/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines; PROPOSED ORDER, filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. Noting Date 4/25/2022, (Silke, David)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION for Order Reopening Plaintiff Dr. Klinghardts deposition, filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) Noting Date 4/29/2022, (Jacobs, Michael)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #165 and #166 Motions to Compel; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' #167 Motion to Compel. Supplemental information due by 4/22/2022. The Court GRANTS Defendants leave to file a motion to reopen the deposition of Dr. Klinghardt. Defendant's Motion will be heard on a second Friday briefing schedule (pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(d)(2)) and should be noted for the Courts consideration on 4/29/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Noting Date Set re #165 MOTION/Letter, #166 MOTION/Letter, #167 MOTION/Letter: Noting Date 4/1/2022. (TF)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order REFERRING #165 TELEPHONIC MOTION/LETTER, #166 TELEPHONIC MOTION/LETTER, #167 TELEPHONIC MOTION/LETTER to: Judge Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Farnoosh Faryabi, Mark Kimball; Def Counsel: Michael Jacobs, Nicole Demmon, Teruyuki Olsen, Wilhelm Dingler, Shellie McGaughey (Counter Deft); CR: Sheri Schelbert; Time of Hearing: 1:00pm; Courtroom: via Zoom video; Discovery Hearing held on 4/8/2022. Parties appear via Zoom video. Court reviews record, conducts colloquy, and hears parties' argument on the discovery letters (Dkt #'s #165 , #166 , #168 , #169 , #170 , #171 , #172 , #173 ). The Court grants in part, denies in part, and defers ruling on the parties' requests. The Court will follow up with a brief written order summarizing the Court's rulings. (TF)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ***NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: Dr. Klinghardt and Dr. Schaffner are directed to appear at the Discovery Conference Hearing set for April 8, 2022 at 1:00 p.m. on Zoomgov.com and to be prepared to address the Court regarding the discovery issues identified by the parties' letters. If Dr. Klinghardt or Dr. Schaffner are not available, they are directed to contact the Court to reschedule the Discovery Conference Hearing.(TF)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Conference Hearing set for 4/8/2022 at 01:00 PM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson on Zoomgov.com. The clerk will send invites. (TF)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 LETTER from Michael G. Jacobs regarding Discovery filed by Christine Schaffner (Traylor, Joe)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 LETTER from Farnoosh Faryabi RE Response to Nicole Demmon's April 1, 2022 Letter re #166 Letter filed by Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 LETTER from Farnoosh Faryabi RE Response to Mike Jacobs #165 April 1, 2022 Letter filed by Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC (Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 4/5/2022 to create linkage (SR).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 LETTER from Nicole E. Demmon Re: #167 Farnoosh Faryabi Letter Re: Discovery filed by Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner (Demmon, Nicole) Modified on 4/5/2022 to create linkage (SR).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 LETTER from Teruyuki S. Olsen re #167 Letter In Response filed by Daniel Schaffner (Olsen, Teruyuki)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 LETTER from Teruyuki A. Olsen re #167 Letter of Response filed by Immanence Ipothecary LLC Christine Schaffner (Olsen, Teruyuki) Modified on 4/4/2022 per filer request incorrect party selected (STP).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #168 Letter : per filer request updated party name to Immanence Ipothecary, LLC. (STP)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TELEPHONIC MOTION PURSUANT TO LCR 7(i)/LETTER from Farnoosh Faryabi RE ESI and Discovery filed by Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC (Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 4/11/2022 to convert to motion (TF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 TELEPHONIC MOTION PURSUANT TO LCR 7(i)/LETTER from Nicole E. Demmon Re: ESI Agreement & Discovery filed by Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner (Demmon, Nicole) Modified on 4/11/2022 to convert to motion (TF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 TELEPHONIC MOTION PURSUANT TO LCR 7(i)/LETTER from Michael G. Jacobs re #140 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Christine Schaffner (Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2022 to convert to motion (TF).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER re Parties' #163 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by parties (Silke, David)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court recommends that Counterclaim Defendant's Motion (dkt. #130 ) be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Objections to R&R, if any, due within fourteen (14) days on which this R&R is signed. This matter is noted for 4/15/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SR)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Amanda Bryan and E. Pennock Gheen, III for Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. (Dingler, Wilhelm)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney E. Pennock Gheen, III; Amanda Bryan and Wilhelm Dingler for Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. (Dingler, Wilhelm)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #160 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel was not signed by E. Pennock Gheen and Amanda Bryan. As such, electronic notice will not be turned off for E. Pennock Gheen and Amanda Bryan. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SR)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Shellie McGaughey for Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt from March 31 to April 8, 2022. (McGaughey, Shellie)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Farnoosh Faryabi; Def Counsel: Teruyuki Olsen; Counter Def Counsel: Michael Kyllo; CR: Debbie Zurn; Time of Hearing: 1:30pm; Courtroom: via Zoom video; Motion Hearing held on 3/17/2022 re: #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims filed by Dietrich Klinghardt. Parties appear via Zoom video. Court reviews record. Court hears arguments. Court takes under advisement. (TF)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Teruyuki S Olsen for Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner from April 3-April 9, 2022; June 24-June 28, 2022; July 2-July 7, 2022. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Mark D Kimball for Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC from April 4, 2022-April 12, 2022. (Kimball, Mark)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION regarding Garden Variety Mental Anguish Damages to Limit Scope of Discovery by parties #154 Praecipe to Attach Document. (Attachments: #1 Email Receipt)(SR)(Filing received via email 3/11/2022, during CM/ECF outage)(Based on phone call with attorney, stipulation is to be filed separately from the praecipe)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PRAECIPE TO STRIKE DOCKET #153 STIPULATION REGARDING GARDEN VARIETY MENTAL ANGUISH DAMAGES TO LIMIT SCOPE OF DISCOVERY re #153 Stipulation by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. (Attachments: *see dkt. #155 for stipulation* #1 Stipulation, #2 Email Receipt)(SR) (Filing received via email 3/11/2022, during CM/ECF outage) Modified on 3/14/2022 to strike exhibit 1 (SR).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ***STRICKEN FROM DOCKET, CORRECTED STIPULATION FILED AT DKT. #155 *** STIPULATION regarding Garden Variety Mental Anguish Damages to Limit Scope of Discovery by parties (McGaughey, Shellie) Modified on 3/14/2022 (SR).
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Jeffrey Kyllo on behalf of Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. (Kyllo, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 PRAECIPE to attach document regarding signature page re #149 Declaration by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt (Attachments: #1 Dkt 149 Signature Page)(McGaughey, Shellie)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #149 Declaration was improperly signed by Michael Kyllo. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SR)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Oral Argument Hearing on #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims : Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2022 at 01:30 PM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The clerk will send Zoom invites. (TF)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Supplemental DECLARATION of Michael Kyllo filed by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(McGaughey, Shellie)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY, filed by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt, TO RESPONSE to #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims (McGaughey, Shellie)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 DECLARATION of Julia Neace filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner re #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims (Olsen, Teruyuki)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 DECLARATION of Eva Christensen filed by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Christine Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Christine Schaffner re #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims (Olsen, Teruyuki)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DECLARATION of Christine Schaffner filed by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Christine Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Christine Schaffner re #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Schaffner Decl., #2 Exhibit B to Schaffner Decl., #3 Exhibit C to Schaffner Decl., #4 Exhibit D to Schaffner Decl., #5 Exhibit E to Schaffner Decl., #6 Exhibit F to Schaffner Decl., #7 Exhibit G to Schaffner Decl., #8 Exhibit H to Schaffner Decl., #9 Exhibit I to Schaffner Decl., #10 Exhibit J to Schaffner Decl., #11 Exhibit K to Schaffner Decl.)(Olsen, Teruyuki)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 DECLARATION of Teruyuki S. Olsen filed by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Christine Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Christine Schaffner re #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Olsen Decl., #2 Exhibit B to Olsen Decl., #3 Exhibit C to Olsen Decl., #4 Exhibit D to Olsen Decl., #5 Exhibit E to Olsen Decl.)(Olsen, Teruyuki)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Christine Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Christine Schaffner, to #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Olsen, Teruyuki)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PRAECIPE to attach document Exhibit G re #109 Declaration,, by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Christine Schaffner in Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery)(Olsen, Teruyuki)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ERRATA re #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims regarding signature page by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt (McGaughey, Shellie)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Compel (dkt. #94 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (dkt. #98 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time (dkt. #119 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Motions related to Discovery due by 4/1/2022, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 4/18/2022, Discovery to be completed by 5/2/2022, Dispositive motions and motions to exclude expert testimony for failure to satisfy Daubert must be filed pursuant to LCR 7(d) by 6/13/2022. Defendants' Motion to Compel (dkt. #136 is STRICKEN without prejudice to refiling. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson (SR)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Farnoosh Faryabi, Mark Kimball; Def Counsel: Michael Jacobs, Nicole Demmon, Teruyuki Olsen, Wilhelm Dingler, Shellie McGaughey (Counter Deft); CR: Marci Chatelain; Time of Hearing: 10:00am; Courtroom: via Zoom video;Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2022 re: Defendants' (dkt. #94 ) MOTION to Compel, Plaintiffs' (dkt. #98 ) MOTION to Compel, and Defendants' (dkt. #119 ) MOTION for Extension of Time. Parties appear via Zoom video. Court reviews record, conducts colloquy, and hears parties' argument on the motions. For reasons stated on the record, the Court: (1) GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defs.' (dkt. #94 ) motion to compel; (2) GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Pls.' (dkt. #98 ) motion to compel; and (3) GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defs.' (dkt. #119 ) motion for extension of time. The Court additionally STRIKES Defendants' (dkt. #136 ) MOTION to Compel without prejudice. The Court will follow up with a brief written order summarizing the Court's rulings.(TF)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 OBJECTIONS re #123 Request Terminate Motions, Notice of Docket Text Modification Deposition of Daniela Deiosso by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC (Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 1/20/2022 to add linkage to #123 Request (SR).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 DECLARATION of Michael G. Jacobs filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner re #136 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiffs Dietrich Klinghardt and Integrative Health Institute PLLC and Reopen Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit No. 2, #3 Exhibit No. 3, #4 Exhibit No. 4, #5 Exhibit No. 5, #6 Exhibit No. 6, #7 Exhibit No. 7, #8 Exhibit No. 8, #9 Exhibit No. 9, #10 Exhibit No. 10, #11 Exhibit No. 11, #12 Exhibit No. 12, #13 Exhibit No. 13, #14 Exhibit No. 14, #15 Exhibit No. 15, #16 Exhibit No. 16, #17 Exhibit No. 17, #18 Exhibit No. 18, #19 Exhibit No. 19)(Jacobs, Michael)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiffs Dietrich Klinghardt and Integrative Health Institute PLLC and Reopen Deposition, filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/4/2022, (Jacobs, Michael)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 DECLARATION of Teruyuki S. Olsen filed by Defendant Daniel Schaffner re #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Olsen, Teruyuki)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Supplemental DECLARATION of Michael G. Jacobs filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner re #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1, #2 Exhibit No. 2, #3 Exhibit No. 3, #4 Exhibit No. 4, #5 Exhibit No. 5, #6 Exhibit No. 6, #7 Exhibit No. 7, #8 Exhibit No. 8, #9 Exhibit No. 9, #10 Exhibit No. 10)(Jacobs, Michael)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPLY, filed by Defendant Daniel Schaffner, TO RESPONSE to #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Olsen, Teruyuki)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPLY, filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner, TO RESPONSE to #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Jacobs, Michael)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 DECLARATION of Michael Kyllo filed by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McGaughey, Shellie)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Counterclaims, filed by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 2/11/2022, (McGaughey, Shellie)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING TIME. The Hearing time has been changed: Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.(TF)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Hearing on the parties' #94 #98 #119 Motions; Oral Argument Hearing is set for 1/24/2022 at 09:30 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, on Zoom platform. The clerk will send Zoom invites.(TF)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC re #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, to #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 DECLARATION of Shellie McGaughey filed by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McGaughey, Shellie)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE, by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt, to #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. (McGaughey, Shellie)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #123 MOTION: Corrected event type from letter to motion per the directions of chambers. (SR)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Motion terminated: #123 MOTION filed by Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Daniel Schaffner. The Motion has been terminated and the event type has been changed from a Motion to a Request per the direction of chambers. (SR)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REQUEST MOTION LETTER from Wilhelm Dingler Re: Request of Deposition of Daniela Deiosso filed by Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner (Dingler, Wilhelm) Modified on 1/11/2022 to edit event type and docket text per the direction of chambers (SR). Modified on 1/11/2022 to edit docket text per direction of chambers (SR).
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES Filed by Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report)(McGaughey, Shellie)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES Filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC.(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECLARATION of Michael G. Jacobs filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Jacobs, Michael)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines, filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/14/2022, (Jacobs, Michael)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DECLARATION of Paulo Santos Alves filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt re #98 MOTION to Compel (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt re #98 MOTION to Compel (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 DECLARATION of Dr. Dietrich Klinghardt filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt re #98 MOTION to Compel (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt, TO RESPONSE to #98 MOTION to Compel (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Supplemental DECLARATION of Michael G. Jacobs filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner re #94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents & Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Jacobs, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY, filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner, TO RESPONSE to #94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents & Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt (Jacobs, Michael)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DECLARATION of Michael G. Jacobs In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel filed by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #98 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Dingler, Wilhelm)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DECLARATION of Teruyuki S. Olsen In Opposition To Motion To Compel Discovery filed by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #98 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Dingler, Wilhelm)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 DECLARATION of Daniel Schaffner In Opposition To Motion To Compel Discovery filed by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #98 MOTION to Compel (Dingler, Wilhelm)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 DECLARATION of Christine Schaffner In Opposition To Motion To Compel Discovery filed by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #98 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, SEALED #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Dingler, Wilhelm) Modified on 1/27/2022 to seal Exhibit 7. Redacted version filed at dkt. #142 (SR).
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, to #98 MOTION to Compel . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Compel)(Dingler, Wilhelm)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by David W Silke on behalf of Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner. (Silke, David)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Nicole E. Demmon added for Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner; per #107 Notice of Attorney Association. (SR)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. Pursuant to the parties' #105 STIPULATION Voluntary Dismissal of Counterclaim and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Defendant Lumvi Skincare, LLC's counterclaim for Abuse of Process asserted in this matter against Plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party. (VE)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION Voluntary Dismissal of Counterclaim by parties (Olsen, Teruyuki)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #103 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs , filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/1/2021, (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER re Defendant's #94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents & Answers to Interrogatories. The Clerk is directed to re-note Defendant's Motion (dkt. #94 ) for the Court's consideration on 12/17/2021. Authorized by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt re #94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents & Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt, to #94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents & Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt. (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt re #98 MOTION to Compel (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Compel Discovery, filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/17/2021, (Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 11/29/2021 to edit document title (SR).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #92 MOTION to Compel ; by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt. (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Teruyuki S Olsen for Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner from December 26, 2021-January 2, 2022; February 16, 2022-February 21, 2022. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DECLARATION of Michael G. Jacobs filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner re #94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents & Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jacobs, Michael)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents & Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt, filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/17/2021 12/3/2021, (Jacobs, Michael) Modified on 11/30/2021 to renote noting date per dkt. #102 (SR).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt re #92 MOTION to Compel (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Compel Discovery , filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/3/2021, (Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 11/16/2021 to edit document title (SR).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Parties' #90 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines by 45 days. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/30/2021, Motions related to discovery due by 1/15/2022, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 2/1/2022, Discovery to be completed by 2/1/2022, Dispositive motions and motions to exclude expert testimony for failure to satisfy Daubert due by 3/4/2022. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines by 45 days, filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2021, (Dingler, Wilhelm)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Wilhelm Dingler for Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner from 12/08/21 - 12/10/21. (Dingler, Wilhelm)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER ADOPTING #73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (dkt. #28 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SR)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Teruyuki S Olsen. Filed by Counter Claimants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Mark D Kimball for Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt from 10/01/2021-10/12/2021. (Kimball, Mark)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE Withdrawal of Notice of Unavailability re #84 Notice of Unavailability ; filed by Defendant Christine Schaffner. (Jacobs, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Michael G Jacobs for Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner from August 30, 2021 to October 1, 2021. (Jacobs, Michael)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Michael G Jacobs for Defendant Christine Schaffner from November 2-12, 2021. (Jacobs, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DECLARATION of Teruyuki S. Olsen filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #78 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt to #73 Report and Recommendations,,. 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Decl. Teruyuki Olsen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Decl. Teruyuki Olsen)(Dingler, Wilhelm)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE to #78 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt to #73 Report and Recommendations, filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner (Dingler, Wilhelm)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to #76 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Lumvi Skincare, LLC by Dietrich Klinghardt(an individual).(McGaughey, Shellie)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Wilhelm Dingler for Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner from 07/26/2021 - 08/06/2021. (Dingler, Wilhelm)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendants Dietrich Klinghardt, Dietrich Klinghardt to #73 Report and Recommendations,,. Noting Date 7/23/2021, (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim with Jury Demand by Dietrich Klinghardt(an individual). (Bridges, Dan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt by Lumvi Skincare, LLC.(Olsen, Teruyuki)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lumvi Skincare, LLC (Olsen, Teruyuki)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Teruyuki S Olsen for Defendants Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, Daniel Schaffner, Counter Claimant Bella Fiore Organics LLC from June 30-July 6; July 22-July 31. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court recommends Plaintiffs' Motion (dkt. #28 ) be DENIED without prejudice. Objections to this Report and Recommendation, if any, should be filed with the Clerk and served upon all parties to this suit within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is signed. If no timely objections are filed, the matter will be ready for consideration by the District Judge on July 9, 2021. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MW)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ANSWER to #64 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt by Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC.(Dingler, Wilhelm)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Lumvi Skincare, LLC on 6/11/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Stricken Telephone Conference on 6/15/2021. The telephone conference set forth in the Court's #24 order setting pretrial schedule has been stricken. (TF)
May 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Farnoosh Faryabi for Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt from 6/3/2021-6/11/2021. (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (MW)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #54 MOTION for Protective Order Proposed Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined Proposed Protective Order)(Bryan, Amanda)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Lumvi Skincare, LLC (MW)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #64 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, Lumvi Skincare, LLC, filed by KS Distributors LLC, Integrative Health Institute PLLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael G Jacobs on behalf of Defendant Christine Schaffner, Counter Claimant Christine Schaffner. (Jacobs, Michael)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- Dep Clerk: tfarrell; Pla Counsel: Farnoosh Faryabi, Mark Kimball; Def Counsel: Teruyuki Olsen, Amanda Bryan, Wilhelm Dingler, Shellie McGaughey; CR: Nickie Drury; Time of Hearing: 10:00am; Courtroom: via Zoom; Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2021 re: Plaintiffs' #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs' #43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, and Defendants' #54 MOTION for Protective Order. The parties appear via Zoom videoconference. Court reviews record. Court conducts colloquy and hears parties' arguments on the motions. For reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS Pltfs' #43 motion to amend complaint and GRANTS Defts' #54 motion for protective order. No later than 5/27/2021, Pltfs shall file their second amended complaint and Defts shall file a new proposed Protective Order. The Court will reserve ruling on Pltfs' #28 motion for preliminary injunction and will file a Report and Recommendation to Judge Jones. (TF)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY, filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, TO RESPONSE to #54 MOTION for Protective Order (Bryan, Amanda)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #54 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Dr. Dietrich Klinghardt filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #54 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt, to #54 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Christine Schaffner filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #54 MOTION for Protective Order (Bryan, Amanda)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Daniel Schaffner filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #54 MOTION for Protective Order (Bryan, Amanda)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DECLARATION of Amanda Bryan filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #54 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bryan, Amanda)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/21/2021, (Bryan, Amanda)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Dkt. #43 ). Based on Mr. Kimball's previously stated unavailability (dkt. #48 ), oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion is scheduled to be heard concurrently with oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (dkt. # 47 ) on May 26, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The Clerk is directed to re-note Plaintiff's Motion (dkt. #43 ) for the Court's consideration on May 21, 2021. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt, TO RESPONSE to #43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECLARATION of Amanda Bryan filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bryan, Amanda)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner, to #43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bryan, Amanda)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER: Based on Mr. Kimball's current unavailability for oral argument, the Clerk is directed to re-note Plaintiff's Motion (dkt. #28 ) for the Court's consideration on 5/21/2021. Authorized by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (SR)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Oral Argument Hearing on Motion re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. The clerk will send Zoom invite to the parties. (TF)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Shellie McGaughey for Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt from May 5-17, 2021. (McGaughey, Shellie)
April 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PRAECIPE re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Page 25 of Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 5/21/2021 4/23/2021, (Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 4/27/2021 (MW).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Teruyuki S Olsen for Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner from April 3 - April 13. (Olsen, Teruyuki)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shellie McGaughey on behalf of Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. (McGaughey, Shellie)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DECLARATION of Mary Sue Abernethy filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Dr. Dietrich Klinghardt filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt, TO RESPONSE to #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of Heather Larson filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Bryan, Amanda)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Daniel Schaffner filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bryan, Amanda)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Dr. Christine Schaffner filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bryan, Amanda)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECLARATION of Amanda Bryan filed by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bryan, Amanda)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner, to #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bryan, Amanda)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION of Farnoosh Faryabi filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Daniela Deiosso filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLARATION of Dr. Dietrich Klinghardt filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt re #28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 3/19/2021 5/21/2021, (Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 4/15/2021 to re-note noting date per dkt #48 (SR).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER: The parties' proposed stipulated protective order (dkt. #26 ) is STRICKEN. The Court will consider a proposed stipulated motion with provision of a redlined version. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiffs Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Counter Defendant Dietrich Klinghardt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 2/1/2021, (Faryabi, Farnoosh)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joe R Traylor on behalf of Defendant Christine Schaffner. (Traylor, Joe)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 4/5/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/15/2021, Motions due by 12/1/2021, Discovery completed by 12/17/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/17/2021, Dispositive motions due by 1/18/2022, Telephone Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.(TF)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 15. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #20 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh) Modified on 11/18/2020 (MW).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caleb Stewart on behalf of Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner. (Stewart, Caleb)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Dietrich Klinghardt by Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Daniel Schaffner, Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC.(Gheen, E.)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Integrative Health Institute PLLC, KS Distributors LLC, Dietrich Klinghardt, Sophia Education LLC, Sophia Nutrition LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faryabi, Farnoosh)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint; by Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Bella Fiore Organics LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner.(Dingler, Wilhelm)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 11/24/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/17/2020, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and Amended General Order 02-19. (TF)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/14/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Amanda Bryan on behalf of Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner. (Bryan, Amanda)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (RE)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Wilhelm Dingler on behalf of Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner. (Dingler, Wilhelm)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by E. Pennock Gheen, III on behalf of Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC, Christine Schaffner. (Gheen, E.)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Bella Fiore Klinik, PLLC, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care, LLC, Bella Fiore Organics, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Daniel Schaffner (Olsen, Teruyuki)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Integrative Health Institute PLLC dba Sophia Health Institute, Sophia Nutrition LLC, Sophia Education LLC, and KS Distributors LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/13/2020. (RE)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bella Fiore Organics, LLC (Olsen, Teruyuki)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care, LLC (Olsen, Teruyuki)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bella Fiore Klinik, PLLC (Olsen, Teruyuki)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-13503-8 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6642585) Attorney Teruyuki S Olsen added to party Bella Fiore Klinik, PLLC(pty:dft), Attorney Teruyuki S Olsen added to party Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Teruyuki S Olsen added to party Bella Fiore Organics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Teruyuki S Olsen added to party Christine Schaffner(pty:dft), Attorney Teruyuki S Olsen added to party Daniel Schaffner(pty:dft), filed by Bella Fiore Organics, LLC, Christine Schaffner, Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care, LLC, Daniel Schaffner, Bella Fiore Klinik, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Olsen, Teruyuki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrative Health Institute PLLC et al v. Schaffner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dietrich Klinghardt
Represented By: Mark D Kimball
Represented By: Farnoosh Faryabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: Mark D Kimball
Represented By: Farnoosh Faryabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KS Distributors LLC
Represented By: Mark D Kimball
Represented By: Farnoosh Faryabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrative Health Institute PLLC a Washington professional limited liability Company doing business as Sophia Health Institute
Represented By: Mark D Kimball
Represented By: Farnoosh Faryabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Education, LLC
Represented By: Mark D Kimball
Represented By: Farnoosh Faryabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Nutrition LLC
Represented By: Mark D Kimball
Represented By: Farnoosh Faryabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Education LLC
Represented By: Mark D Kimball
Represented By: Farnoosh Faryabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Schaffner
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Represented By: Wilhelm Dingler
Represented By: Amanda Bryan
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen, III
Represented By: Caleb Stewart
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Joe R Traylor
Represented By: Michael G Jacobs
Represented By: Nicole E. Demmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fiore Klinik, PLLC
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fiore Organics, LLC
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care, LLC
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Schaffner
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Represented By: Caleb Stewart
Represented By: Michael G Jacobs
Represented By: Wilhelm Dingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fiore Organic Skin Care LLC
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Represented By: Wilhelm Dingler
Represented By: Amanda Bryan
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen, III
Represented By: Caleb Stewart
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Nicole E. Demmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fiore Klinik PLLC
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Represented By: Wilhelm Dingler
Represented By: Amanda Bryan
Represented By: E. Pennock Gheen, III
Represented By: Caleb Stewart
Represented By: David W Silke
Represented By: Nicole E. Demmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Fiore Organics LLC
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Represented By: Caleb Stewart
Represented By: Wilhelm Dingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumvi Skincare, LLC
Represented By: Teruyuki S Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?