NXP USA Inc et al v. Impinj Inc
Plaintiff: NXP BV and NXP USA Inc
Defendant: Impinj Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01503
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECLARATION of Ramsey M. Al-Salam filed by Defendant Impinj Inc re #63 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Al-Salam, Ramsey)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, filed by Defendant Impinj Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/18/2020, (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7. (Farmer, Tyler)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DECLARATION of Ramsey M. Al-Salam filed by Defendant Impinj Inc re #60 MOTION to Stay (Partial) Pending Completion of Inter Partes Review (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Al-Salam, Ramsey)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Stay (Partial) Pending Completion of Inter Partes Review, filed by Defendant Impinj Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/11/2020, (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #53 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas W Ritchie for Plaintiffs NXP BV and for NXP USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re #54 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Yury Kalish for Plaintiffs NXP BV and NXP USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re #50 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David L Witcoff Plaintiffs NXP BV, and for NXP USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #52 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Hendershot for Plaintiffs NXP BV and for NXP USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #51 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney T Kaitlin Crowder for Plaintiffs NXP BV, and for NXP USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Yury Kalish FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs NXP BV, NXP USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6724080 (Farmer, Tyler)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas W. Ritchie FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs NXP BV, NXP USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-6724027 (Farmer, Tyler)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael C. Hendershot FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs NXP BV, NXP USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6724012 (Farmer, Tyler)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY T. Kaitlin Crowder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs NXP BV, NXP USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6724003 (Farmer, Tyler)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David L. Witcoff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs NXP BV, NXP USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6723906 (Farmer, Tyler)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/12/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/25/2020, Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2020. (KMP)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and referred to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and Amended General Order 02-19. (KMP)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/23/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ruben Tyler Kendrick on behalf of Defendant Impinj Inc. (Kendrick, Ruben)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stevan Richard Stark, Jr on behalf of Defendant Impinj Inc. (Stark, Stevan)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christina J McCullough on behalf of Defendant Impinj Inc. (McCullough, Christina)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam on behalf of Defendant Impinj Inc. (Al-Salam, Ramsey)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer on behalf of Plaintiffs NXP BV, NXP USA Inc. (Farmer, Tyler)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of of Delaware, Wilmington and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of Delaware, Wilmington, Case Number 1:19-cv-01875.
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (RE)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The motion to transfer (D.I. #9 ) is GRANTED. The above-captioned case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/23/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/23/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) and Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents (No. 60) filed by Impinj, Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)[Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Impinj (No. 1) and (2) Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Impinj (No. 60) filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding a request that the Court set a Scheduling Conference. (Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Corrected DECLARATION of Peter M. Roossien re #33 Letter, by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 5/5/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Kelly E. Farnan, regarding corrected Roossien Declaration. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 5/5/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' First and Second Sets of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-59) filed by Impinj, Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendant Impinj, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents (Nos. 1-43) filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Impinj (Nos. 54-59) filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Impinj, Inc. (Nos. 1-53) filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impinj, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1 - 43) filed by Impinj, Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Valerie Caras regarding NXP's Supplemental Submission Opposing Impinj's Motion to Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Caras, Valerie) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Steven J. Balick regarding Impinj's Supplemental Submission in Support of its Motion to Transfer (D.I. 9). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Balick, Steven) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER: The Motion Hearing set for today, 2/13/2020, will now start at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/13/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2020 re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington. Local counsel present for plaintiff: S. Fineman. Local counsel present for defendant: S. Balick. (Court Reporter Patrick O'Hare, Wilcox & Fetzer.) (crb) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORAL ORDER: A hearing on the Motion to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington (D.I. #9 ) is now set for 2/13/2020, at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2020. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Request Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of Yukio Morikubo re #19 Reply Brief, by Impinj, Inc.. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Ramsey M. Al-Salam re #19 Reply Brief, by Impinj, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Balick, Steven) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington filed by Impinj, Inc.. (Balick, Steven) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Peter M. Roossien re #16 Answering Brief in Opposition, by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 12/20/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DECLARATION of David L. Witcoff re #16 Answering Brief in Opposition, by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 12/20/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2019. (Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Impinj, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Impinj, Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington. Answering Brief due 12/19/2019, Reply Brief due 1/2/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/9/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the briefing on Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) to December 19, 2019 for Plaintiffs' Answering Brief and to January 2, 2020 for Defendant's Reply Brief - filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Ramsey M. Al-Salam re #10 Opening Brief in Support, by Impinj, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Balick, Steven) Modified on 11/26/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECLARATION of Yukio Morikubo re #10 Opening Brief in Support, by Impinj, Inc.. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 11/26/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington filed by Impinj, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/9/2019. (Balick, Steven) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Washington - filed by Impinj, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balick, Steven) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order, by Impinj, Inc.. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 11/25/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 Stipulation and Proposed Order (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Impinj, Inc. answer due 12/12/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/25/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David L. Witcoff for NXP B.V. and NXP USA, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to November 27, 2019 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Impinj, Inc. answer due 11/27/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/29/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to November 27, 2019 - filed by Impinj, Inc.. (Balick, Steven) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David L. Witcoff - filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David L. Witcoff, filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/10/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by NXP USA, Inc., NXP B.V.. Impinj, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Impinj, Inc. on 10/7/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent NXP Semiconductors N.V. for NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc. filed by NXP B.V., NXP USA, Inc.. (mal) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s): See Attachment. (mal) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Impinj, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2748060.) - filed by NXP USA, Inc., NXP B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) [Transferred from ded on 10/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NXP USA Inc et al v. Impinj Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NXP BV
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Represented By: David L Witcoff
Represented By: Thomas W Ritchie
Represented By: Yury Kalish
Represented By: Michael Hendershot
Represented By: T Kaitlin Crowder
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NXP USA Inc
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Represented By: David L Witcoff
Represented By: Thomas W Ritchie
Represented By: Yury Kalish
Represented By: Michael Hendershot
Represented By: T Kaitlin Crowder
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impinj Inc
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: Ramsey M Al-Salam
Represented By: Stevan Richard Stark, Jr.
Represented By: Christina J McCullough
Represented By: Ruben Tyler Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?