Allstate Indemnity Company v. Lindquist et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Randy Lindquist and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2020cv01508
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Haist, Frederick)
December 4, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.(Haist, Frederick)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendant's #12 Motion to Continue Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment; and denying Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Strike. The court also DIRECTS the Clerk to re-note Allstate's summary judgment motion (Dkt. #8 ) for February 5, 2021. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
November 30, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Kathryn M. Knudsen filed by Defendant Randy Lindquist re #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Judicial Estoppel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Knudsen, Kathryn)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Roger Howson filed by Defendant Randy Lindquist re #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Judicial Estoppel (Knudsen, Kathryn)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Craig S. Sternberg filed by Defendant Randy Lindquist re #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Judicial Estoppel (Knudsen, Kathryn)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Defendant Randy Lindquist, to #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Judicial Estoppel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knudsen, Kathryn)
November 27, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Defendant Randy Lindquist, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Continue under Fed. R. Civ. P 56(d) (Knudsen, Kathryn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company, to #12 MOTION to Continue under Fed. R. Civ. P 56(d). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Judson)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Kathryn M. Knudsen filed by Defendant Randy Lindquist re #12 MOTION to Continue under Fed. R. Civ. P 56(d) (Knudsen, Kathryn)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue under Fed. R. Civ. P 56(d), filed by Defendant Randy Lindquist. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/27/2020, (Knudsen, Kathryn)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 12/22/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/1/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/15/2020. (AD)
November 13, 2020 Attorney Kathryn M Knudsen added for Randy Lindquist; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Isaac Ruiz on behalf of Defendant Randy Lindquist. (Ruiz, Isaac)
November 12, 2020 Attorney Frederick A Haist added for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Rory Leid filed by Plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company re #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Judicial Estoppel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Leid, Rory)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Judicial Estoppel, filed by Plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/5/2021 12/4/2020, (Leid, Rory) Modified to re-note motion on 12/3/2020 (LH).
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Fred B Burnside on behalf of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Burnside, Fred)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Randy Lindquist mailed on 10/28/2020 (Taylor, Judson)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company (Leid, Rory)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company (Taylor, Judson)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Judson Taylor. Filed by Plaintiff Allstate Indemnity Company. (Taylor, Judson)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Randy Lindquist. (Attachments: #1 Summons-JPMorgan)(RE)
October 15, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (RE)
October 15, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Allstate Indemnity Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/22/2020. (RE)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Randy Lindquist (Receipt # AWAWDC-6659423), filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Judson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Lindquist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Lindquist
Represented By: Kathryn M Knudsen
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Judson Taylor
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?