Northwest Administrators Inc v. Pyramid San Francisco Management LP
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Pyramid San Francisco Management LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv01561
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/10/2020, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Pyramid San Francisco Management LP on 10/26/2020 (Reid, Russell)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pyramid San Francisco Management LP (SG)
October 23, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds Pursuant to Employer's Withdrawal against defendant(s) Pyramid San Francisco Management LP (Receipt # AWAWDC-6684939), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Pyramid San Francisco Management LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyramid San Francisco Management LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?