Glenn v. Trident Seafood Company
Plaintiff: Travis Glenn
Defendant: Trident Seafood Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01583
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Robert McKenzie on behalf of Plaintiff Travis Glenn. (McKenzie, Allen)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. The Court hereby appoints Allen McKenzie with the law firm Kram & Wooster, P.S., as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel is directed to file a Notice of Appearance within ten (10) calendar days. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court refers this matter to Pro Bono Panel to represent Plaintiff. After that, the Court will issue an order appointing the attorney. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM) cc: E. Nero
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/11/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE: Plaintiff Travis Glenn has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Motion terminated per the direction of chambers: #11 MOTION for Sevice by U.S. Marshal filed by Travis Glenn. Defendant has filed a #13 Waiver of Service. (PM)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Trident Seafood Company mailed on 11/19/2020 (Stone, Benjamin)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Defendant Trident Seafood Company, to #11 MOTION for Sevice by U.S. Marshal. (Stone, Benjamin)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Sevice by U.S. Marshal, filed by Plaintiff Travis Glenn. Noted by Clerk for 12/4/2020. (PM)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathryn Childers on behalf of Defendant Trident Seafood Company. (Childers, Kathryn)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Stone on behalf of Defendant Trident Seafood Company. (Stone, Benjamin)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Travis Glenn. Noting Date 11/27/2020. (PM)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Plaintiff Travis Glenn. (PM)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to Plaintiff requesting summons be completed and returned to Clerk to issue. (PM) cc: letter and blank summons form sent to Plaintiff via USPS
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant Trident Seafood Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Travis Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (PM)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Mary Alice Theiler, filed by Travis Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn v. Trident Seafood Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trident Seafood Company
Represented By: Benjamin J Stone
Represented By: Kathryn Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Glenn
Represented By: Allen Robert McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?