National Fair Housing Alliance et al v. Redfin Corporation
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Long Island Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, Lexington Fair Housing Council, South Suburban Housing Center, National Fair Housing Alliance, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Open Communities and Fair Housing Justice Center
Defendant: Redfin Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01586
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 27 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Further Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond and Initial Scheduling Dates, filed by Defendant Redfin Corporation. Noting Date 8/12/2021, (Rummage, Stephen)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. Deadlines are extended as follows: Response to Complaint due 9/16/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/16/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/20/2021, Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2021. (AMD)
May 21, 2021 Filing 25 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Further Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond and Initial Scheduling Dates, filed by Defendant Redfin Corporation. Noting Date 5/21/2021, (Rummage, Stephen)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Stipulated Motion Extending Time to Answer/Respond and Initial Scheduling Dates signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. Response to Complaint due 6/18/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/11/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/21/2021, Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2021.(TW)
March 2, 2021 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION Further Extending Time to Answer and Initial Scheduling Dates, filed by Defendant Redfin Corporation. Noting Date 3/2/2021, (Rummage, Stephen)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. The FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/13/2021, The Response to Complaint Deadline is 3/20/2021, The Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/22/2021, The Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Deadline is 3/29/2021. (KMC)
December 28, 2020 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond and Initial Scheduling Dates, filed by Defendant Redfin Corporation. Noting Date 12/28/2020, (Rummage, Stephen)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF REFERENCE: All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number C20-1586JLR-TLF. The court ORDERS that the above-entitled action is referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa Fricke for specific purposes and types of motions. The court further DIRECTS and EMPOWERS Magistrate Judge Theresa Fricke to conduct hearings and make further necessary orders consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636, the local rules, and this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' #18 Stipulation: The Defendant will file its response to the Complaint no later than January 20, 2021. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by parties (Rummage, Stephen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
November 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/25/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Chava Brandriss for Defendant Redfin Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 17, 2020 Attorneys Robert J Maguire and Arthur A. Simpson added for Redfin Corporation; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Redfin Corporation (Rummage, Stephen)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Chava Brandriss FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Redfin Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6745519 (Rummage, Stephen)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephen M. Rummage on behalf of Defendant Redfin Corporation. (Rummage, Stephen)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Redfin Corporation on 11/2/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Fair Housing Justice Center, Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Lexington Fair Housing Council, Long Island Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, National Fair Housing Alliance, Open Communities, South Suburban Housing Center. (Taren, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/12/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/19/2021, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
November 3, 2020 JSR deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 1/26/2021, (TW)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Diane L Houk for Plaintiffs Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Fair Housing Justice Center, Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Lexington Fair Housing Council, Long Island Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, National Fair Housing Alliance, Open Communities, and South Suburban Housing Center by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Plaintiffs Samuel Shapiro for Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Fair Housing Justice Center, Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Lexington Fair Housing Council, Long Island Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, National Fair Housing Alliance, Open Communities, and South Suburban Housing Center, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Samuel Shapiro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Fair Housing Justice Center, Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Lexington Fair Housing Council, Long Island Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, National Fair Housing Alliance, Open Communities, South Suburban Housing Center (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6706392 (Taren, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Morgan Williams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Fair Housing Justice Center, Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Lexington Fair Housing Council, Long Island Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, National Fair Housing Alliance, Open Communities, South Suburban Housing Center (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6706380 (Taren, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Diane L. Houk FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Fair Housing Justice Center, Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Lexington Fair Housing Council, Long Island Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, National Fair Housing Alliance, Open Communities, South Suburban Housing Center (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6706355 (Taren, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Fair Housing Justice Center, Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, HOPE Fair Housing Center, Lexington Fair Housing Council, Long Island Housing Services, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, National Fair Housing Alliance, Open Communities, South Suburban Housing Center (Taren, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Redfin Corporation. (RE)
October 29, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, All Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/5/2020, if applicable. (RE)
October 29, 2020 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (RE)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FAIR HOUSING ACT - FEDERAL QUESTION JURISDICTION against defendant(s) Redfin Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6701130) Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party Fair Housing Justice Center(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party HOPE Fair Housing Center(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party Lexington Fair Housing Council(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party Long Island Housing Services(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party National Fair Housing Alliance(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party Open Communities(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Lynn Taren added to party South Suburban Housing Center(pty:pla), filed by Lexington Fair Housing Council, Fair Housing Justice Center, Long Island Housing Services, Open Communities, Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit, Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council, Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania, National Fair Housing Alliance, South Suburban Housing Center, HOPE Fair Housing Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Taren, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fair Housing Alliance et al v. Redfin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Rights Center in Southeastern Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Center of Metropolitan Detroit
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Island Housing Services
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Milwaukee Fair Housing Council
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Fair Housing Council
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Suburban Housing Center
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fair Housing Alliance
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPE Fair Housing Center
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Communities
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing Justice Center
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Taren
Represented By: Samuel Shapiro
Represented By: Diane L Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redfin Corporation
Represented By: Robert J Maguire
Represented By: Stephen M Rummage
Represented By: Chava Brandriss
Represented By: Arthur A. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?