New World Medical Inc et al v. Microsurgical Technology Inc
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Colorado, New World Medical, Inc. and New World Medical Inc
Defendant: Microsurgical Technology, Inc. and Mircosurgical Technology Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01621
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lawrence M Sung for Defendant Mircosurgical Technology Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 28, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Halma Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Halma PLC for Mircosurgical Technology Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mircosurgical Technology Inc (Malkin, Harold)
December 28, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, DEFENDANTS ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS JURY TRIAL DEMANDED with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs by Mircosurgical Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Malkin, Harold)
December 28, 2020 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexander B. Owczarczak FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mircosurgical Technology Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6833864 (Malkin, Harold)
December 28, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Teresa M. Summers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mircosurgical Technology Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6833757 (Malkin, Harold)
December 28, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lawrence M. Sung FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mircosurgical Technology Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6833753 (Malkin, Harold)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patrick D Vellone for Plaintiff The Regents of the University of Colorado, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Vandana Koelsch for Plaintiff The Regents of the University of Colorado, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Todd Tucker for Plaintiff New World Medical Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 30, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Vandana S. Koelsch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff The Regents of the University of Colorado (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6771262 (Walters, Mark)
November 30, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patrick D. Vellone FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff The Regents of the University of Colorado (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6771251 (Walters, Mark)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kyle Timothy Deighan for Plaintiff New World Medical Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kyle Deighan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff New World Medical Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6754335 (Walters, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Todd Tucker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff New World Medical Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-6754323 (Walters, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(F) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/18/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/1/2021, Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2021. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(F) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/30/2020, Joint Status Report due by 1/13/2021. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/30/2020, Joint Status Report due by 1/13/2021. (AQ)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AQ)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida, re #7 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time. Mircosurgical Technology Inc answer due 12/28/2020.(AQ)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/23/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by parties (Malkin, Harold)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily Dodds Powell on behalf of Defendant Mircosurgical Technology Inc. (Powell, Emily)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Harold A Malkin on behalf of Defendant Mircosurgical Technology Inc. (Malkin, Harold)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SG)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mircosurgical Technology Inc (SG)
November 5, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SG)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by New World Medical, Inc. (Walters, Mark)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Microsurgical Technology, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # BWAWDC-6715547) Attorney Mark P Walters added to party New World Medical, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Mark P Walters added to party The Regents of the University of Colorado (pty:pla), filed by New World Medical, Inc., The Regents of the University of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Walters, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New World Medical Inc et al v. Microsurgical Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of Colorado
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Represented By: Vandana Koelsch
Represented By: Patrick D Vellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New World Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New World Medical Inc
Represented By: Mark P Walters
Represented By: Todd Tucker
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Deighan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsurgical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mircosurgical Technology Inc
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Represented By: Harold A Malkin
Represented By: Lawrence M Sung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?