Ha v. Good Chevrolet et al
Plaintiff: Hieu Ha
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Good Chevrolet and JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv01651
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADJUSTING DEADLINES re parties' #16 Stipulation. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/22/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/29/2021, Joint Status Report due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) Modified on 12/18/2020: cc Plaintiff via USPS (PM).
December 17, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER ADJUSTING DEADLINES by parties (Dashiell, Thomas)
December 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement . Filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. Noting Date 1/15/2021, (Taylor, Bryan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement . Filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. Noting Date 12/18/2020, (Taylor, Bryan)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/22/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/29/2020. (LC)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. Judge Barbara J. Rothstein no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Taylor, Bryan)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Thomas L Dashiell on behalf of Defendant Good Chevrolet. (Dashiell, Thomas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement , filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2021 12/4/2020, (Taylor, Bryan) Modified on 12/16/2020 (MW).
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John S Devlin, III on behalf of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Devlin, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Good Chevrolet (King, Brian)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (Taylor, Bryan)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Taylor, Bryan)
November 10, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/17/2020. (SG)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
November 10, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Bryan C. Taylor re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Taylor, Bryan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-14785-1 KNT; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6725067), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Taylor, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ha v. Good Chevrolet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hieu Ha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Bryan C Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Chevrolet
Represented By: Brian M King
Represented By: Thomas L Dashiell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Bryan C Taylor
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?