Arrasmith-Bennett v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Teri Arrasmith-Bennett
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01657
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Per D Jansen on behalf of Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Jansen, Per)
November 23, 2020 ***Deadlines terminated. Plaintiff's counsel, this matter is an ERISA action for review on the administrative record, and is exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f). (GT)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/1/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/8/2021, Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2021. (GT)
November 20, 2020 Attorney Hans N Huggler added for Unum Life Insurance Company of America; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America mailed on 11/11/2020 11/20/2020 (Cowell, Jesse) Modified on 11/23/2020 to correct date waiver was mailed to Defendant (PM).
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Reilly, D)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D Michael Reilly on behalf of Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Reilly, D)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
November 12, 2020 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SG)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney R Darrin Class on behalf of Plaintiff Teri Arrasmith-Bennett. (Class, R)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher E Roy on behalf of Plaintiff Teri Arrasmith-Bennett. (Roy, Christopher)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR LONG-TERM DISABILITY INSURANCE BENEFITS against defendant(s) Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Receipt # AWAWDC-6730234), filed by Teri Arrasmith-Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowell, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrasmith-Bennett v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Per D Jansen
Represented By: Hans N Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Arrasmith-Bennett
Represented By: Jesse Cowell
Represented By: R Darrin Class
Represented By: Christopher E Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?