Andersen v. National Association of Letter Carriers et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Andersen
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers Branch 79, National Association of Letter Carriers, United States Postal Service and Louis DeJoy
Case Number: 2:2020cv01678
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin Daniel Berger on behalf of Defendants National Association of Letter Carriers, National Association of Letter Carriers Branch 79. (Berger, Benjamin)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Defendants Louis DeJoy, United States Postal Service. (Morehead, Sarah)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/12/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/19/2021. (LC)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
November 16, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6737827) Attorney Patricia S Rose added to party Shannon Andersen(pty:pla), filed by Shannon Andersen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rose, Patricia) Modified on 11/16/2020 to edit party name. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersen v. National Association of Letter Carriers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Andersen
Represented By: Patricia S Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers Branch 79
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?