Northwest Administrators Inc v. Global Expirence Specialists Inc
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Global Expirence Specialists Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01680
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Daniele Naki, Administrative Assistant on 11/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/11/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Global Expirence Specialists Inc (SG)
November 17, 2020 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds Pursuant to Audit against defendant(s) Global Expirence Specialists Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-6740266), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Global Expirence Specialists Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Expirence Specialists Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?