Northwest Administrators Inc v. Hussmann Corporation
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Hussmann Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01689
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: THIS MATTER comes before the Court on the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement and Request for Dismissal, docket no. #10 . Having reviewed the filing, the Court enters the following order. Counsel having advised the Court that this matter has been resolved, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Courts determination, NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. In the event settlement is not perfected, either party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
December 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Request for Dismissal by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reid, Russell)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Hussmann Corporation on 11/23/2020 (Reid, Russell)
December 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: The deadline for Hussmann Corporation to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to 1/4/2021. (FMR)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleadings, filed by Defendant Hussmann Corporation. Noting Date 12/8/2020, (Lansverk, Eric)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric David Lansverk on behalf of Defendant Hussmann Corporation. (Lansverk, Eric)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amy Blaisdell for Defendant Hussmann Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amy L. Blaisdell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Hussmann Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6788291 (Lansverk, Eric)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/19/2021, (FMR)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Hussmann Corporation (SG)
November 18, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds Pursuant to Audit against defendant(s) Hussmann Corporation (Receipt # AWAWDC-6743177), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Hussmann Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussmann Corporation
Represented By: Amy Blaisdell
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?