Gale Force Nine LLC v. Wizards of the Coast LLC
Plaintiff: Gale Force Nine, LLC and Gale Force Nine LLC
Defendant: Wizards of the Coast LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01700
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rose McCarty on behalf of Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC. (McCarty, Rose)
December 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MaryAnn Tatiana Almeida on behalf of Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC. (Almeida, MaryAnn)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/13/2021, Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2021. (AQ)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING #21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. #4 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
November 30, 2020 Filing 22 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Gale Force Nine LLC to #21 Report and Recommendations,,. Noting Date 12/14/2020, (Forner, Eric)
November 25, 2020 Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court recommends denying GF9's motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. #4 ). Given the expedited nature of the motion and relief sought, the Court finds that the deadline for filing objections, if any, to this Report and Recommendation, shall be accelerated. Objections may be filed and served upon all parties no later than Monday, November 30, 2020. The Clerk should note the matter for Wednesday, December 2, 2020, as ready for the District Judge's consideration if no objection is filed. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MW)
November 24, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Dan Barrett filed by Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Howard, James)
November 24, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Ann Earp filed by Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Howard, James)
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC, to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Howard, James)
November 24, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Wizards of the Coast LLC on 11/19/2020, filed by Plaintiff Gale Force Nine LLC. (Krider, Thomas)
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Battlefront Miniatures Ltd. for Gale Force Nine LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gale Force Nine LLC (Krider, Thomas)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC shall file its response by Tuesday, November 24, 2020. The response may not exceed twenty-four pages in length, and no reply will be permitted. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC. (Howard, James)
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James E Howard on behalf of Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC. (Howard, James)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Reconsideration: The Court rescinds the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. #9 ) and Order Adopting (Dkt. #11 ). A briefing schedule for the motion for temporary restraining order will issue under separate Order. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***RESCINDED PER #12 ORDER*** ORDER ADOPTING #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #4 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW) Modified on 11/20/2020 (MW).
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Eric P. Forner filed by Plaintiff Gale Force Nine LLC re #9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gale Force Nine LLC., #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric Forner, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Eric Forner)(Forner, Eric)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Gale Force Nine LLC., #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Gale Force Nine LLC. Noting Date 11/20/2020, (Forner, Eric)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC. (Howard, James)
November 20, 2020 NOTE: Document #8 Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, was filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney James E Howard is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (MW)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 ***RESCINDED PER #12 ORDER*** REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida, re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2020, Noting Date 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(AQ) Modified on 11/20/2020 (MW).
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AQ)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of John-Paul Brisigotti filed by Plaintiff Gale Force Nine LLC re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Dec of Paul Brisigotti, #2 Exhibit B to Dec of Paul Brisigotti, #3 Exhibit C to Dec of Paul Brisigotti, #4 Exhibit D to Dec of Paul Brisigotti)(Forner, Eric)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Gale Force Nine LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/19/2020, (Forner, Eric)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Wizards of the Coast LLC (CDA)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric P Forner and Thomas R. Krider on behalf of Plaintiff Gale Force Nine, LLC. (Forner, Eric) Modified on 11/18/2020 add second attorney's name (CDA).
November 18, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (CDA)
November 18, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/25/2020. (CDA)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Breach of Implied Duty of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Declaratory Relief, and Injunctive Relief against defendant(s) Wizards of the Coast LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6745488) Attorney Eric P Forner added to party Gale Force Nine, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Gale Force Nine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Forner, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gale Force Nine LLC v. Wizards of the Coast LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wizards of the Coast LLC
Represented By: James E Howard
Represented By: Rose McCarty
Represented By: MaryAnn T Almeida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Force Nine, LLC
Represented By: Eric P Forner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Force Nine LLC
Represented By: Eric P Forner
Represented By: Thomas R Krider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?