Kessler v. Dumplings of Fury LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Defendant: THINKING MAN'S LLC, Dumplings of Fury LLC, Gina Terrana, Mary Kirchner, Arthur Terrana and Carmelo Terrana
Case Number: 2:2020cv01740
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Kessler.(Judnich, M. William)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #9 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall, within 7 days of the date of this Order, file an amended pleading substantially in the form of Dkt. # [9-1]. The amended pleading will replace the existing complaint in its entirety. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Judnich, M. William)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2021, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Gary A. Trabolsi on behalf of Defendant Thinking Man's LLC. (Trabolsi, Gary)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2021, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
December 16, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT)
December 14, 2020 Attorney Sydney M. Safley added for Dumplings of Fury LLC, Thinking Man's LLC; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hamilton Harcourt Gardiner on behalf of Defendants Dumplings of Fury LLC, Thinking Man's LLC. (Gardiner, Hamilton)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1710; 2:20-cv-1729; 2:20-cv-1757; 2:20-cv-1776, by Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Judnich, M. William)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dumplings of Fury LLC, Thinking Man's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Thinking Man's LLC)(RE)
November 25, 2020 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6761308) Attorney M. William Judnich added to party Robert Kessler(pty:pla), filed by Robert Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Dumplings of Fury LLC, #3 Summons Thinking Man's LLC)(Judnich, M. William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler v. Dumplings of Fury LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THINKING MAN'S LLC
Represented By: Hamilton Harcourt Gardiner
Represented By: Sydney M. Safley
Represented By: Gary A. Trabolsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dumplings of Fury LLC
Represented By: Hamilton Harcourt Gardiner
Represented By: Sydney M. Safley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Terrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Terrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmelo Terrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Represented By: M. William Judnich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?