Kessler v. JRC Station LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Defendant: JRC Station LLC
Interested Party: Duke Chan Ahn
Case Number: 2:2020cv01757
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STRIKING ANSWER re Plaintiff's #6 Motion. There is no indication that Mr. Ahn is an attorney licensed to practice law in this district or that defendant is otherwise represented by counsel. The answer Mr. Ahn filed is therefore STRICKEN. The Court will not consider, and plaintiff need not respond to, Dkt. #4 . The defendant shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to acquire counsel and respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION Strike Answer re #4 Answer to Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2021, (Judnich, M. William)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Interested Party Duke Chan Ahn has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
December 24, 2020 Filing 4 ***STRICKEN*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Duke Ahn. (LH) Modified filing as stricken on 1/19/2021 (LH).
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1710; 2:20-cv-1729; 2:20-cv-1740; 2:20-cv-1776, by Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Judnich, M. William)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) JRC Station LLC (SG)
December 1, 2020 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SG)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) JRC STATION LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-6770837) Attorney M. William Judnich added to party Robert Kessler(pty:pla), filed by Robert Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Judnich, M. William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler v. JRC Station LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRC Station LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Represented By: M. William Judnich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Duke Chan Ahn
Represented By: Duke Chan Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?