Green v. United States Coast Guard et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sioux Green
Defendant: United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Veterans Administration and Does 1 through 1000
Case Number: 2:2020cv01804
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 24 JUDGMENT BY COURT: The court GRANTS the Government's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and DISMISSES the complaint without prejudice. (Order (Dkt. #23 ).) (LH)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION: The court GRANTS the Government's motion to dismiss Ms. Green's complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (Dkt. #10 ) and DISMISSES her complaint without prejudice. The court further DENIES Ms. Green's motion to reopen (Dkt. #6 ) as moot. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Coast Guard on 1/29/2021, filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green. (Green, Carolyn)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 2/23/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/2/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/16/2021. (AD)
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Defendants United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Veterans Administration, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Motion for Summary Judgment (Waldrop, Matt)
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374 (Green, Carolyn)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Defendants United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Veterans Administration, to #6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374. (Waldrop, Matt)
December 28, 2020 Noting Date Reset re Plainitff's #6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374: Noting Date reset to 1/1/2021, per LCR 7(d)(3). Motions terminated at the direction of the court: Plaintiff's #16 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE, and #17 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE. Dkt. # #16 and #17 are responses to Defendant's #10 Motion to Dismiss; respective docket entries modified accordingly. (AD)
December 24, 2020 Filing 17 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Motion for Summary Judgment., filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach20 Dr. Mark TOMSKI, #2 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach21 Dr. Charlie PAXON, #3 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach22 Dr Adam GEIGER, #4 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach23 Dr. Nelson HAGER, #5 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach24 Dr. Daniel SECREST, #6 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach25 Brain Damage and Body Harm, #7 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach26 Dept of VA brought up 5th Amendment, #8 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach27 Medical Malpractice, maiming, #9 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach28 photos of Carolyn set-one, #10 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach28 photos of Carolyn set-two, #11 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach29 Kindle-LOCKEDmanuscript-DEC-24-2020hyperlinked@2230, #12 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach30 A couple of longtime references for Carolyn) Noting Date 1/15/2021, (Green, Carolyn) Modified on 12/28/2020 - to reflect that filing is a response, not a new motion (AD).
December 24, 2020 Filing 16 CROSS-MOTION AND RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Motion for Summary Judgment., filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach11 DRUG Transparency PART 2, #2 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach12 DRUG Transparency PART 3, #3 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach13 DRUG Transparency PART 4, #4 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach14 Names of medical and other providers, #5 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach15 USCG COURT Cases PART 1, #6 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach16 USCG COURT Cases PART 2, + SPLAT, #7 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach17 MRI cervical -neck- history, and Pain Clinic, #8 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach18 part-1 Dr. BEDNARZ Chiropractic Care, #9 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach18 part-2 Dr. Bednarz Chiropractic Care, #10 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach19 part-1 Ruth MCCAULEY Physical Therapist, #11 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach19 part-2 Ruth McCauley Physical Therapist) Noting Date 1/15/2021, (Green, Carolyn) Modified on 12/28/2020 to reflect that filing is a response, not a new motion (AD).
December 24, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green, to #6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach1 A Solution, #2 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach2 USCG briefly, #3 220cv01804 Attach3 VA Patient Rights, #4 220cv01804 Attach4 VA in short, #5 220cv01804 Attach5 Dr. PAXON Carolyn's side note, #6 220cv01804 Attach6 DRUG Transparency PART 1, #7 220cv01804 Attach7 How Long it Took, #8 220cv01804 Attach8 Some history of Carolyn and the VA system, #9 220cv01804 Attach9 WA State COURT Cases federal and state, #10 Supplement 220cv01804 Attach10 WA State COURT Case 320cv06112-BHS with some EXH frm 20-2-07852-8)(Green, Carolyn)
December 23, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/28/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Robert Gyenes filed by Defendants United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Veterans Administration re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Motion for Summary Judgment (Waldrop, Matt)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Michael Bartley filed by Defendants United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Veterans Administration re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Motion for Summary Judgment (Waldrop, Matt)
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Veterans Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2021, (Waldrop, Matt)
December 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re #6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374 ADDING of RECORDS by Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attach 3 LOCKED book (300 pages))(Green, Carolyn)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re #6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374 ADDING of RECORDS by Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attach 1 attorneys + case numbers, #2 Supplement Attach 2 names of medical providers, #3 Supplement Attach 4 carolyn photos set one before/after maiming, #4 Supplement Attach 4 Carolyn photos set two before/after maiming, #5 Supplement Attach 5 Locked book + evidence sent to)(Green, Carolyn)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Reopen Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374, filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Sioux Green. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff MOTION TO REOPEN Case No. 95-36172, and DOT 95-0374) Noting Date 12/18/2020 1/1/2021. (Green, Carolyn) Modified on 12/28/2020 to correct noting date (AD).
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
December 15, 2020 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SG)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants United States Coast Guard, United States Department of Veterans Administration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Records)(Waldrop, Matt)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 STATE DOCUMENTSfiled by Plaintiff in King County Superior Court No. 20-1-15087-SEA against defendant(s) United States Department of Veterans Administration, United States Coast Guard with JURY DEMAND, filed by United States Department of Veterans Administration, United States Coast Guard.(Waldrop, Matt) (No Fee Required) Modified on 12/15/2020 - remove state complaint to file separately(SG).
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-15087-8-SEA; filed by United States Department of Veterans Administration, United States Coast Guard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waldrop, Matt) (No Fee Required) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2020: #2 Complaint) #3 Jury Demand) (SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. United States Coast Guard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Coast Guard
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Administration
Represented By: Matt Waldrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sioux Green
Represented By: Carolyn Sioux Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?