McFarland v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Company of America UNUM Life Insurance, Dr. Neil A McFarland and Neil A McFarland
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01823
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America mailed on 12/21/2020 1/11/2021 (Class, R) Modified on 1/12/2021 (MW).
January 8, 2021 Attorney D Michael Reilly added for Unum Life Insurance Company of America; per #3 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephania Camp Denton on behalf of Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Denton, Stephania)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/8/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/22/2021, (SRS)
December 21, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Receipt # AWAWDC-6818304) Attorney R Darrin Class added to party Neil A McFarland(pty:pla), filed by Neil A McFarland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Class, R) Modified on 12/21/2020 to edit party name. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Company of America UNUM Life Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Neil A McFarland
Represented By: R Darrin Class
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil A McFarland
Represented By: R Darrin Class
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stephania Camp Denton
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?