In re: Ron Perey
In Re: Ron Perey
Case Number: 2:2020rd00015
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Walter T McGovern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (DS)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Attorney has voluntarily resigned from the Washington State Bar Association. Changed status in ECF to Inactive with remarks. Mailed Order to address on docket. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. (DS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE from the Washington State Bar Association that attorney has voluntarily resigned.(DS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Mail addressed to Perey Law Group, 1606 Eighth Ave N. Seattle, WA 98109 returned as Undeliverable with handwriting "No longer at this address" re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Mailed Order to addresses on docket. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2020. (DS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE from the Washington State Supreme Court, Suspension Order No. 201,955-2, Administrative Suspension for Failure to Comply with 2020 Licensing Requirements. (DS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Ron Perey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ron Perey
Represented By: Ronald Jason Perey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?