State of Washington et al v. Russell Vought et al
Plaintiff: Association Of King County Historical Organizations, State of Washington, Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Tanana Chiefs Conference, State of Oregon, Washington Trust for Historic Preservation, Historic Seattle, Spokane Tribe of Indians, Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians, The Klamath Tribes, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Museum Of History And Industry, Suquamish Tribe, Nez Perce Tribe, Nooksack Indian Tribe, OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle, Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Doyon Ltd, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Hoh Indian Tribe, Chinese American Citizens Alliance, Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, HistoryLink, Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, American Historical Association, Squaxin Island Tribe, Wing Luke Memorial Foundation doing business as Wing Luke Museum, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Samish Indian Nation, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos, Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Quinault Indian Nation, Duwamish Tribe, City of Seattle, Metlakatla Indian Community, Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Nisqually Indian Tribe, Shoalwater Bay Indian Tribes, Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc and Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe
Defendant: National Archives and Records Administration, Emily W. Murphy, Office of Management and Budget, General Services Administration, Russell Vought, Adam Bodner, Public Buildings Reform Board, David S. Ferriero, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero and Katy Kale
Amicus Curiae: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality and Historians
Case Number: 2:2021cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE - Notice of Withdrawal of Administrative Decision ; filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kipnis, Brian)
February 22, 2021 Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #48 stipulation for a 60-day stay of this matter. This action shall be STAYED for 60 days from the date of this order. Defendants' cross-motion to dismiss (Dkt No. #36 ) shall remain pending before the Court throughout the duration of this stay, with the deadlines for remaining briefing on the motion also stayed during the 60-day period. The parties shall, no later than 55 days from the date of this order, file a joint report. The preliminary injunction issued by the Court (Dkt. No. #45 ) shall remain in full force and effect throughout the stay. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PM)
February 19, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Bernadette Connor. Filed by Plaintiff OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle. (Connor, Bernadette)
February 19, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/19/2021 before Judge John C. Coughenour.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nickoline Drury, nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2021, (ND)
February 19, 2021 Filing 48 Stipulated MOTION - Stipulation for Order Staying Action for 60-Days; Order Thereon, filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 2/19/2021, (Kipnis, Brian)
February 18, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Derek Red Arrow Frank on behalf of Plaintiff Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. (Frank, Derek)
February 18, 2021 Filing 46 PRAECIPE to attach document Signature sheet re #44 Notice of Appearance by Plaintiff OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle (Connor, Bernadette)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting Korematsu Center's #25 Motion for Leave to File. Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and those persons in active concert or participation with them are PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED from selling the Archives facility pursuant to duties established by FASTA and from taking any actions to facilitate or effectuate a sale of the Archives facility under FASTA until a final determination on the merits is issued by this Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(MW)
February 12, 2021 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #44 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Bernadette Yuan Connor. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SR)
February 12, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bernadette Connor on behalf of Plaintiff OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle. (Connor, Bernadette)
February 12, 2021 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff State of Washington for proceedings held on 02/12/2021 re 42 Motion Hearing,,,,,,,. Requesting Attorney: Lauryn K. Fraas.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). You MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Nickoline Drury (nickoline_drury@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8508) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (Fraas, Lauryn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 42 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour- Dep Clerk: Gabriel Traber; Pla Counsel: Kristin Beneski, Lauryn Faas, and Lloyd Miller; Def Counsel: Brian Kipnis; CR: Nickie Drury; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM; Courtroom: Zoom;Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2021 re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, American Historical Association, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Duwamish Tribe, Samish Indian Nation, Chinese American Citizens Alliance, Doyon Ltd, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, HistoryLink, Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians, Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Spokane Tribe of Indians, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle, Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Wing Luke Memorial Foundation, Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Washington Trust for Historic Preservation, State of Oregon, Squaxin Island Tribe, Nooksack Indian Tribe, Quinault Indian Nation, Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians, Association Of King County Historical Organizations, Suquamish Tribe, Nez Perce Tribe, Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, Historic Seattle, Hoh Indian Tribe, Museum Of History And Industry, The Klamath Tribes, State of Washington, Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe. After hearing argument from Counsel, the Court informs the parties that an order granting the Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction will be issued. (GT)
February 11, 2021 Filing 41 Second DECLARATION of Lauryn K. Fraas filed by Plaintiffs Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc, American Historical Association, Association Of King County Historical Organizations, Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Chinese American Citizens Alliance, City of Seattle, Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians, Doyon Ltd, Duwamish Tribe, Historic Seattle, HistoryLink, Hoh Indian Tribe, Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Metlakatla Indian Community, Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Museum Of History And Industry, Nez Perce Tribe, Nisqually Indian Tribe, Nooksack Indian Tribe, OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation, Quinault Indian Nation, Samish Indian Nation, Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe, Shoalwater Bay Indian Tribes, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, Spokane Tribe of Indians, Squaxin Island Tribe, State of Oregon, State of Washington, Suquamish Tribe, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Tanana Chiefs Conference, The Klamath Tribes, Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Washington Trust for Historic Preservation, Wing Luke Memorial Foundation re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit 16)(Fraas, Lauryn)
February 11, 2021 Filing 40 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc, American Historical Association, Association Of King County Historical Organizations, Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Chinese American Citizens Alliance, City of Seattle, Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians, Doyon Ltd, Duwamish Tribe, Historic Seattle, HistoryLink, Hoh Indian Tribe, Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Metlakatla Indian Community, Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Museum Of History And Industry, Nez Perce Tribe, Nisqually Indian Tribe, Nooksack Indian Tribe, OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation, Quinault Indian Nation, Samish Indian Nation, Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe, Shoalwater Bay Indian Tribes, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, Spokane Tribe of Indians, Squaxin Island Tribe, State of Oregon, State of Washington, Suquamish Tribe, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Tanana Chiefs Conference, The Klamath Tribes, Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Washington Trust for Historic Preservation, Wing Luke Memorial Foundation, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Fraas, Lauryn)
February 10, 2021 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Kipnis, Brian)
February 10, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law - Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board. (Kipnis, Brian)
February 10, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law and Proposed Form of Injunctive Relief, filed by Plaintiffs Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc, American Historical Association, Association Of King County Historical Organizations, Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Chinese American Citizens Alliance, City of Seattle, Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians, Doyon Ltd, Duwamish Tribe, Historic Seattle, HistoryLink, Hoh Indian Tribe, Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Metlakatla Indian Community, Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Museum Of History And Industry, Nez Perce Tribe, Nisqually Indian Tribe, Nooksack Indian Tribe, OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation, Quinault Indian Nation, Samish Indian Nation, Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe, Shoalwater Bay Indian Tribes, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, Spokane Tribe of Indians, Squaxin Island Tribe, State of Oregon, State of Washington, Suquamish Tribe, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Tanana Chiefs Conference, The Klamath Tribes, Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Washington Trust for Historic Preservation, Wing Luke Memorial Foundation. (Fraas, Lauryn)
February 4, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #36 MOTION Notice of Motion and Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss. Per request of filer, added linkage to #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and #32 Response. (MW)
February 4, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION Notice of Motion and Defendants' Cross-Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). F.R.CIV.P. re #30 Amended Complaint, #32 Response to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 2/26/2021, (Kipnis, Brian) Modified to add linkage to Motion and Response on 2/4/2021 (MW).
February 3, 2021 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Frank Quigley filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Kipnis, Brian)
February 3, 2021 Filing 34 DECLARATION of John Dugan filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Kipnis, Brian)
February 3, 2021 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Brian C. Kipnis filed by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kipnis, Brian)
February 3, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Defendants Adam Bodner, Rob Fairweather, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Katy Kale, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board, to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument Requested. (Kipnis, Brian)
January 27, 2021 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: A remote hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is scheduled for February 12, 2021 at 9 a.m. (Dkt. No. #29 .) In preparation for this hearing, the parties are ORDERED to submit to the Court for its review, no later than February 10, 2021, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law and a proposed form of injunctive relief, should the Court adopt the parties' respective proposals. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (LH)
January 25, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #30 Amended Complaint : per counsel request struck filers Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality and Historians from list for whom they are filing on behalf. (STP)
January 25, 2021 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Association Of King County Historical Organizations, American Historical Association, Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians, Duwamish Tribe, Suquamish Tribe, State of Oregon, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, State of Washington, Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation, Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Squaxin Island Tribe, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Wing Luke Memorial Foundation, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Samish Indian Nation, Nez Perce Tribe, Spokane Tribe of Indians, Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Historic Seattle, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Historians, Doyon Ltd, Washington Trust for Historic Preservation, HistoryLink, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Hoh Indian Tribe, The Klamath Tribes, Nooksack Indian Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Chinese American Citizens Alliance, Museum Of History And Industry, Quinault Indian Nation, Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, Aleutian Islands Pribilof Association, Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, Chickaloon Village Traditional Council, Shoalwater Bay Indian Tribes, City of Seattle, Nisqually Indian Tribe, Metlakatla Indian Community.(Fraas, Lauryn) Modified on 1/25/2021 per counsel request struck two filers from list filing on behalf (STP).
January 22, 2021 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER re parties' #27 #28 letter briefs re Plaintiffs' #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' response is due by the end of the day on February 3, 2021. Plaintiffs' reply is due by the end of the day on February 11, 2021. The remote hearing on this matter (see Dkt. No. #18 ) is CONTINUED to February 12, 2021 at 9 a.m.. Plaintiffs' #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is renoted for 2/11/2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PM)
January 22, 2021 Filing 28 LETTER from Defendants' requesting additional time to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Adam Bodner, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Emily W Murphy, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board, Russell Vought (Kipnis, Brian)
January 21, 2021 Filing 27 LETTER from State of Washington at Court's direction re schedule for preliminary injunction motion filed by State of Washington (Beneski, Kristin)
January 21, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Stricken Status Conference on 1/21/2021. (GT)
January 20, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM via zoom before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(GT)
January 14, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, filed by Amicus Parties Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Historians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Historians and the Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality as Amici in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/29/2021, (Chang, Robert)
January 14, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Seungchul Chang on behalf of Amicus Parties Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Historians. (Chang, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/12/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/19/2021, Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2021. (GT)
January 13, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour- Dep Clerk: Gabriel Traber; Pla Counsel: Lauryn Fraas and Gabriel Galanda; Def Counsel: Brian Kipnis; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM; Courtroom: Zoom; Status Conference held on 1/13/2021. The Court inquires if the Defendants intend to take action regarding the property prior to the January 29, 2021 noting date of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defense addresses the Court. Plaintiff's address the Court. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court orders the current briefing schedule to remain. (GT)
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendants Adam Bodner, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Emily W Murphy, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board, Russell Vought. (Kipnis, Brian)
January 11, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to appear for a remote status conference at 10 a.m. on January 13, 2021. Because this order is being issued before all parties have appeared, Plaintiffs' counsel is further DIRECTED to deliver a copy of this order to representatives for parties who have not yet appeared. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (MW)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alison M Dreizen for Plaintiff American Historical Association, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 8, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to appear for a remote hearing on Plaintiffs' #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction at 9:00 a.m. on January 29, 2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (MW)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of All Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declarations)(Fraas, Lauryn)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Lauryn K. Fraas filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12)(Fraas, Lauryn)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/29/2021, (Fraas, Lauryn)
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to All Defendants and Hand Delivered to U.S. Attorney's Office, Seattle, (1/6/21), on 1/7/2021, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorraine A Parlange on behalf of Plaintiff Kalispel Tribe of Indians. (Parlange, Lorraine)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Adam Bodner, David S Ferriero, General Services Administration, Emily W Murphy, National Archives and Records Administration, Office of Management and Budget, Public Buildings Reform Board, Russell Vought (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(PM)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alison M. Dreizen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff American Historical Association (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6853684 (Schneider, Harry)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa A Anderson on behalf of Plaintiff Puyallup Tribe of Indians. (Anderson, Lisa)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Harold Chesnin. Filed by Plaintiff Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation. (Chesnin, Harold)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1231-RSL; 2:20-cv-1232-RSL; 2:20-cv-1233-RSL; 2:20-cv-1364-RSL, by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lloyd B Miller for Plaintiffs Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Doyon Ltd, and for Tanana Chiefs Conference, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lloyd B. Miller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Doyon Ltd, Tanana Chiefs Conference (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6850085 (Dreveskracht, Ryan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc Attorneys Parlange and Connor
January 4, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6845618) Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party American Historical Association(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Association Of King County Historical Organizations(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Chinese American Citizens Alliance(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes Of The Coos, Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Doyon, Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Duwamish Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Historic Seattle(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party HistoryLink(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Hoh Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Kalispel Tribe of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Muckleshoot Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Museum Of History And Industry(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Nez Perce Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Nooksack Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Puyallup Tribe of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Quinault Indian Nation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Samish Indian Nation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Skokomish Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Snoqualmie Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Spokane Tribe of Indians(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Squaxin Island Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Suquamish Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Swinomish Indian Tribal Community(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Tanana Chiefs Conference(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party The Klamath Tribes(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Upper Skagit Indian Tribe(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Washington Trust for Historic Preservation(pty:pla), Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party Wing Luke Memorial Foundation d/b/a Wing Luke Museum(pty:pla), filed by Association Of King County Historical Organizations, American Historical Association, Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians, Duwamish Tribe, Suquamish Tribe, State of Oregon, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, State of Washington, Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation, Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Squaxin Island Tribe, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Wing Luke Memorial Foundation d/b/a Wing Luke Museum, Samish Indian Nation, Nez Perce Tribe, Spokane Tribe of Indians, Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Historic Seattle, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Muckleshoot Indian Tribe, Snoqualmie Indian Tribe, Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska, Doyon, Limited, Washington Trust for Historic Preservation, HistoryLink, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Hoh Indian Tribe, The Klamath Tribes, Nooksack Indian Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle, Confederated Tribes Of The Coos, Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians, Chinese American Citizens Alliance, Museum Of History And Industry, Quinault Indian Nation, Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Vought, #3 Summons Ferriero, #4 Summons Bodner, #5 Summons Murphy, #6 Summons NARA, #7 Summons OMB, #8 Summons PBRB, #9 Summons GSA)(Fraas, Lauryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington et al v. Russell Vought et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association Of King County Historical Organizations
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Alanna Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Nathan Bays
Represented By: Spencer W Coates
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Council of the Tlingit and Haida Indian Tribes of Alaska
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Richard D Monkman
Represented By: Lloyd B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swinomish Indian Tribal Community
Represented By: Emily Rae Hutchinson Haley
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanana Chiefs Conference
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Richard D Monkman
Represented By: Lloyd B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Carla Scott
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Trust for Historic Preservation
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Alanna Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Historic Seattle
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Alanna Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spokane Tribe of Indians
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Richard Kirk Eichstaedt
Represented By: Scott Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes Of Siletz indians
Represented By: Kathleen Gargan
Represented By: Craig J Dorsay
Represented By: Lea Ann Easton
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Klamath Tribes
Represented By: Edmund Clay Goodman
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skokomish Indian Tribe
Represented By: Earle David Lees, III
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Museum Of History And Industry
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Alanna Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suquamish Tribe
Represented By: James Rittenhouse Bellis
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nez Perce Tribe
Represented By: Julie Sobotta Kane
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nooksack Indian Tribe
Represented By: Charles N Hurt
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCA Asian Pacific Advocates Greater Seattle
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Bernadette Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe
Represented By: Lauren P Rasmussen
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doyon Ltd
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Richard D Monkman
Represented By: Lloyd B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe
Represented By: Rogina D Beckwith
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Alexander
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muckleshoot Indian Tribe
Represented By: Danielle L Bargala
Represented By: Mary Michelle Neil
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Robert Leighton Otsea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoh Indian Tribe
Represented By: Kathleen Gargan
Represented By: Craig J Dorsay
Represented By: Lea Ann Easton
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chinese American Citizens Alliance
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Heidi B Bradley
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snoqualmie Indian Tribe
Represented By: Rob Roy Smith
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Rachel Saimons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HistoryLink
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Represented By: Alanna Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quileute Tribe Of The Quileute Reservation
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Lauren King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation
Represented By: Anthony S Aronica
Represented By: Ethan A. Jones
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Derek Red Arrow Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Historical Association
Represented By: Harry H Schneider, Jr.
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Alison M Dreizen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Squaxin Island Tribe
Represented By: David W Babcock
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wing Luke Memorial Foundation doing business as Wing Luke Museum
Represented By: Gloria Lung Wakayama
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalispel Tribe of Indians
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Lorraine A Parlange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation
Represented By: Harold Chesnin
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cow Creek Band Of Umpqua Tribe Of Indians
Represented By: Ryan David Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S Galanda
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Anthony S. Broadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puyallup Tribe of Indians
Represented By: Felecia L Shue
Represented By: Alec Stewart Wrolson
Represented By: Lois Y Boome
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Lisa A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upper Skagit Indian Tribe
Represented By: David Stoller Hawkins
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samish Indian Nation
Represented By: Kathleen Gargan
Represented By: Craig J Dorsay
Represented By: Lea Ann Easton
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes Of The Coos, Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians
Represented By: Richard Kirk Eichstaedt
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Scott Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinault Indian Nation
Represented By: Lori Ellen Bruner
Represented By: Karen D Allston
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duwamish Tribe
Represented By: Natalie Jean Richards Reid
Represented By: Bart J. Freedman
Represented By: Endre M Szalay
Represented By: Benjamin Arthur Mayer
Represented By: Theodore J Angelis
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Adam Nolan Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Represented By: Jeremy F. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metlakatla Indian Community
Represented By: Geoffrey David Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chickaloon Village Traditional Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes Of The Coos Lower Umpqua And Siuslaw Indians
Represented By: Richard Kirk Eichstaedt
Represented By: Scott Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nisqually Indian Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoalwater Bay Indian Tribes
Represented By: Geoffrey David Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation
Represented By: Naomi Leigh Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon
Represented By: Tyler J Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleutian Pribilof Islands Association, Inc
Represented By: Geoffrey David Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe
Represented By: Jack Warren Fiander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Archives and Records Administration
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily W. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Vought
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bodner
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Buildings Reform Board
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Ferriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Fairweather
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S Ferriero
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Kale
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Historians
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?